Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995107

EP0995107 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR ANALYSIS OF HYDROCARBON SPECIES BY NEAR INFRARED SPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.08.2004  [2004/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASHLAND OIL, INC.
P.O. Box 391
Ashland, KY 41101 / US
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / WELCH, William, T.
8137 Country View
Ashland, KY 41101 / US
02 / SUMNER, Michael, B.
2921 Route 75
Huntington, WV 25704 / US
03 / WILT, Brian, K.
922 West Alexander
Ashland, KY 41102 / US
04 / BLEDSOE, Roy, Roger
1430 Buena Vista Drive
Huntington, WV 25704 / US
05 / MAGGARD, Steven, M.
106 Plum Circle Road
Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date97933509.809.07.1997
[2000/17]
WO1997US12436
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902973
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995107
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/35, G01N33/22
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR ANALYSE VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN MIT HILFE VON INFRAROTSPEKTROSKOPIE[2000/17]
English:PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR ANALYSIS OF HYDROCARBON SPECIES BY NEAR INFRARED SPECTROSCOPY[2000/17]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ANALYSE D'HYDROCARBURES PAR SPECTROSCOPIE DANS L'INFRAROUGE PROCHE[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase28.12.1999National basic fee paid 
28.12.1999Search fee paid 
28.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
03.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/35]
22.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200105   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2002
31.07.200206   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2003
31.07.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US5349189  (MAGGARD STEVEN M [US]);
 [A]US4800279  (HIEFTJE GARY M [US], et al);
 [A]US5349188  (MAGGARD STEVEN M [US])