Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979088

EP0979088 - METHOD OF INDUCING VASODILATION AND TREATING PULMONARY HYPERTENSION USING ADENOVIRAL-MEDIATED TRANSFER OF THE NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASE GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.05.2006  [2006/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION
55 Fruit Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
For all designated states
Leuven Research & Development V.Z.W.
Benedenstraat 59A Groot Begijnhof
B-3000 Leuven / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION
55 Fruit Street
Boston, MA 02110 / US
For all designated states
Leuven Research & Development V.Z.W.
Benedenstraat 59A Groot Begijnhof
B-3000 Leuven / BE
Inventor(s)01 / JANSSENS, Stefan
Koning Leopold III-Iaan 53
B-3001 Heverlee / BE
02 / BLOCH, Kenneth, D.
Apartment 32, 80 Park Street
Brooklyn, MA 02146 / US
03 / COLLEN, Désiré
Schoonzichtlaan 20
B-3020 Winksele / BE
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Sheard, Andrew Gregory , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Sheard, Andrew Gregory , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date97933529.617.07.1997
[2000/07]
WO1997US12510
Priority number, dateUS19960021912P17.07.1996         Original published format: US 21912 P
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9802170
Date:22.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979088
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.01.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/70, C07H21/04, C12N15/12, C12N15/63, A61K48/00
[2002/44]
Former International [2000/07]A61K31/70, C07H21/04, C12N15/12, C12N15/63
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR INDUZIERUNG VON GEFÄSSERWEITERUNG UND ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER PULMONALER HOCHBLUTDRUCK MITTELS ADENOVIRUS-GELENKTES TRANSFER DES STICKSTOFFOXIDSYNTHASE GENS[2000/07]
English:METHOD OF INDUCING VASODILATION AND TREATING PULMONARY HYPERTENSION USING ADENOVIRAL-MEDIATED TRANSFER OF THE NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASE GENE[2000/07]
French:PROCEDE SERVANT A PROVOQUER LA VASODILATATION ET A TRAITER L'HYPERTENSION PULMONAIRE AU MOYEN DU TRANSFERT PROVOQUE PAR ADENOVIRUS DU GENE DE SYNTHASE D'OXYDE NITRIQUE[2000/07]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase03.02.1999National basic fee paid 
03.02.1999Search fee paid 
03.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.02.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
14.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/18]
01.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200509   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]  JANSSENS STEFAN ET AL, "Homogeneous myocardial expression of human constitutive nitric oxide synthase by adenoviral gene transfer during syngeneic heterotopic heart transplantation.", CIRCULATION, 68th Scientific Session of the American Heart Association;Anaheim, California, USA; November 13-16, 1995, (1995), vol. 92, no. 8 SUPPL., ISSN 0009-7322, page I502, XP008006498 [X] 11-14 * abstract 2398 *
 [A]  THUSU KAJORI G ET AL, "The cGMP phosphodiesterase inhibitor zaprinast enhances the effect of nitric oxide.", DATABASE BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, Database accession no. PREV199698601285, XP002211918 [A] 12 * abstract *
    [] AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, (1995), vol. 152, no. 5 PART 1, ISSN 1073-449X, pages 1605 - 1610,
 [DA]  COHEN ALAN H ET AL, "Inhibition of cyclic 3'-5'-guanosine monophosphate-specific phosphodiesterase selectively vasodilates the pulmonary circulation in chronically hypoxic rats.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (1996), vol. 97, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 172 - 179, XP002211917 [DA] 12 * page 172 * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI118386
 [A]  ZIEGLER JAMES W ET AL, "Dipyridamole, a cGMP phosphodiesterase inhibitor, causes pulmonary vasodilation in the ovine fetus.", DATABASE BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, Database accession no. PREV199598495022, XP002211919 [A] 12 * abstract *
    [] AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 269, no. 2 PART 2, ISSN 0002-9513, pages H473 - H479,
International search[X]US5498539  (HARRISON DAVID G [US], et al);
 [Y]US5485827  (ZAPOL WARREN M [US], et al)
 [X]  - JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, July 1996, Vol. 98, No. 2, JANSSENS et al., "Adenoviral-Mediated Transfer of the Human Endothelial Nitric Oxide Synthase Gene Reduces Acute Hypoxic Pulmonary Vasoconstriction in Rats", pages 317-324.,
 [X]  - DATABASE MEDLINE ON DIALOG, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE, (Bethesda, MD, USA), No. 96435198, SETOGUCHI et al., "Transfer of Endothelial Nitric Oxide Synthase Gene in Purpose of Gene Therapy for Pulmonary Arterial Hypertension"; & JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MEDICINE, February 1996, Vol. 54, No. 2, pages 369-376.,
 [X]  - DATABASE MEDLINE ON DIALOG, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE, (Bethesda, MD, USA), No. 96295016, TZENG et al., "Vascular Gene Transfer of the Human Inducible Nitric Oxide Synthase: Characterization of the Activity and Effects on Myointimal Hyperplasia"; & MOLECULAR MEDICINE, March 1996, Vol. 2, No. 2, pages 211-225.,