Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0921866

EP0921866 - DRY PHYSICAL SEPARATION OF PARTICULATE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU
For all designated states
TECHNOLOGICAL RESOURCES PTY. LTD.
Level 39, 55 Collins Street
Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2003/42]For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2612 / AU
For all designated states
TECHNOLOGICAL RESOURCES PTY. LTD.
Level 39, 55 Collins Street
Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2612 / AU
For all designated states
TECHNOLOGICAL RESOURCES PTY. LTD.
Level 39, 55 Collins Street
Melbourne, VIC 3001 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / O'CONNOR, Maureen, Teresa
3/29 Augustus Street
Toowong, QLD 4066 / AU
02 / CLOUT, John, Michael, Frederick
20 Woodward Place
Pullenvale, QLD 4069 / AU
03 / GANNON, John, Francis
1 Skenes Avenue
Eastwood, NSW 2122 / AU
04 / WELLER, Keith, Russell
12 Dellamara Street
Chapel Hill, QLD 4069 / AU
[1999/24]
Representative(s)Casey, Lindsay Joseph , et al
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[N/P]
Former [1999/24]Casey, Lindsay Joseph , et al
F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date97933594.011.08.1997
[1999/24]
WO1997AU00507
Priority number, dateAU1996PO0156912.08.1996         Original published format: AU PO156996
[1999/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9806513
Date:19.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0921866
Date:16.06.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998
[1999/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0921866
Date:15.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU19.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B07B13/11
[1999/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/24]
TitleGerman:TROCKENPHYSIKALISCHE TRENNUNG VON KÖRNIGEN MATERIAL[1999/24]
English:DRY PHYSICAL SEPARATION OF PARTICULATE MATERIAL[1999/24]
French:SEPARATION PHYSIQUE A SEC DE MATIERE PARTICULAIRE[1999/24]
Entry into regional phase12.03.1999National basic fee paid 
12.03.1999Search fee paid 
12.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
12.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/24]
27.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
19.05.2003Fee for grant paid
19.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41]
Request for further processing for:15.05.2003Request for further processing filed
19.05.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.06.2003Decision despatched
08.02.2002Request for further processing filed
08.02.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.04.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR15.10.2003
[2006/14]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0139783  (OELDE GMBH VENTILATORFAB [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-12 * page 3, line 5 - page 6, line 27 * * figure - *;
 [X]US2079059  (WINKLEMAN EDWARD J) [X] 1,2,8,12 * page 1, column R, line 8 - page 3, column L, line 2 * * figure - *;
 [X]AT386767B  (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]) [X] 1-3,12 * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 41 * * figure - *
International search[X]GB2042935  (SATAKE ENG CO LTD);
 [Y]RU2018383  ;
 [Y]FR2644086  (IL SHIN IND CO LTD [KR]);
 [Y]DE4117029  (STEINERT GMBH ELEKTROMAGNETBAU [DE])
 [Y]  - DERWENT ABSTRACT, Accession No. 95-121650/16, Class P43; & RU,C,2 018 383 (KHARK AGRIC MECHN ELECTRIF INST), 30 August 1994.,