Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0888450

EP0888450 - ADDITIVE FOR A WASHING OR CLEANING AGENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID ADDITIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  29.11.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2002Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 15.01.2003  [2003/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/01]For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNEPP-HENTRICH, Kathrin
Carlo-Schmid-Strasse 74
D-40595 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / WICHE, Adolf
Sophienstrasse 3
D-40597 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / SCHUMACHER, Eric
Jahnstrasse 94
D-40764 Langenfeld / DE
04 / MARKIEFKA, Josef
Bad Harzburger Strasse 61
D-40595 Düsseldorf / DE
05 / LARSON, Bernd
In Tenholt 64
D-41812 Erkelenz / DE
[1999/01]
Application number, filing date97933648.402.07.1997
[1999/01]
WO1997EP03468
Priority number, dateDE199612742708.07.1996         Original published format: DE 19627427
DE199613228409.08.1996         Original published format: DE 19632284
[1999/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9801531
Date:15.01.1998
Language:DE
[1998/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0888450
Date:07.01.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998
[1999/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0888450
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0888450
Date:15.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/03]
Search report(s)International search reportEP09.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/06, C11D3/395, C11D11/00
[1999/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/01]
TitleGerman:WASCH- ODER REINIGUNGSMITTELADDITIV SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[1999/01]
English:ADDITIVE FOR A WASHING OR CLEANING AGENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID ADDITIVE[1999/01]
French:ADDITIF POUR PRODUITS DE LAVAGE OU DE NETTOYAGE, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE[1999/01]
Entry into regional phase12.03.1998National basic fee paid 
12.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.03.1998Examination requested  [1999/01]
06.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2000Fee for grant paid
31.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.02.2001  02.03.2001  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2002/02]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.2001  02.03.2001  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2001/16]
Opponent(s)01  23.02.2001  02.03.2001  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
30.03.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.07.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
14.06.2002Reply to a communication from the opposition division
04.07.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.07.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.10.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
13.11.2002Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9401526  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,2,11-13 * claims 1-11 *;
 [PXA]DE19521365  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [PX] 1,2 * claims 1-11 * * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 32 * [A] 11;
 [A]WO9504124  (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * claims 1-17 *;
 [A]WO9403568  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 5 - line 9 * * page 5, line 17 - line 21 * * page 12, line 4 - line 7 * * page 22, line 19 - line 24 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0342043  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * example 1 *;
 [A]US5516447  (BAUER VOLKER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *
OppositionUS4997590
 US4486327
 EP0266863
 EP0639639
 WO9206162
 EP0373743
 WO9716519
 US5516449
 US5334324
 EP0342985
 EP0639638
 US4590237