Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969749

EP0969749 - TOBACCO DRYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited
Globe House, 1 Water Street
London WC2R 3LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited
Globe House, 1 Water Street
London WC2R 3LA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / TATHAM, Ian, Ernest
108 Downscourt Road Purley
Surrey CR8 1BD / GB
02 / STONE, William, John
Calamere Loperwood Southampton
Hampshire SO40 2RT / GB
03 / HIRSCH, Werner
Dürenackersweg 10
D-22523 Hamburg / DE
04 / WEISS, Arno, Eugen, Wilfried
Scharpenmoor 94
D-22848 Norderstedt / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Walford, Margot Ruth , et al
Patents Department, British-American Tobacco Co. Ltd., Technology Centre, Regents Park Road
Southampton SO15 8TL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Walford, Margot Ruth , et al
Patents Department, British-American Tobacco Co. Ltd., Technology Centre, Regents Park Road
Southampton SO15 8TL / GB
Application number, filing date97933793.831.07.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997GB02050
Priority number, dateGB1997000641227.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9706412
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843501
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969749
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969749
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A24B3/04, F26B17/10
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:TABAK-TROCKNER[2000/02]
English:TOBACCO DRYERS[2000/02]
French:SECHOIRS A TABAC[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase27.10.1999National basic fee paid 
27.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
21.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2002Fee for grant paid
08.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
FR18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
DK18.12.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2007/17]
Former [2006/14]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
FR18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2005/21]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/48]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/29]GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
PT19.12.2002
Former [2003/20]GR18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE18.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0074059  (B.A.T. CIGARETTEN-FABRIKEN GMBH) [A] 1 * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 15; figure 3 *;
 [A]GB2147982  (BROWN & WILLIAMSON TOBACCO CORPORATION) [A] 1 * page 2, line 61 - page 4, line 26; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US3399462  (KOCH) [A] 1,12,13 * column W *;
 [A]FR923428  (REAVELL) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2054441  (PEEBLES) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013476  (PEEBLES) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE916998  (PEHRSON) [A] 1 * the whole document *