Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0861142

EP0861142 - PUMP, PUMP AND HOLDER ASSEMBLY, PERSONAL-CARE APPLIANCE, AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.07.2001 [2001/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1998/36]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / WESTERHOF, Willem, Auke
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / PEZIJ, Lambertus, Jan
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[1998/36]
Representative(s)Bos, Kornelis Sjoerd , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/14]Bos, Kornelis Sjoerd , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1998/36]Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date97933817.515.08.1997
[1998/36]
WO1997IB00993
Priority number, dateEP1996020240029.08.1996         Original published format: EP 96202400
[1998/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9808661
Date:05.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0861142
Date:02.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998
[1998/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0861142
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE05.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:B26B21/44, // F04B45/04
[1998/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/36]
TitleGerman:PUMPE,PUMPE UND BEHÄLTERANORDNUNG KÖRPERPFLEGEAPPARAT UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENBAUEN EINER PUMPE[1998/36]
English:PUMP, PUMP AND HOLDER ASSEMBLY, PERSONAL-CARE APPLIANCE, AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A PUMP[1998/36]
French:POMPE, POMPE ET ENSEMBLE RESERVOIR, APPAREIL POUR SOINS D'HYGIENE PERSONNELLE ET PROCEDE POUR ASSEMBLER UNE POMPE[1998/36]
Entry into regional phase29.05.1998National basic fee paid 
29.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
07.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/45]
07.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2000Fee for grant paid
20.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE2162031  (AUERGESELLSCHAFT GMBH);
 [A]US5402697  (BROOKS SHIRLEY E [US]);
 [Y]US3359634  (BECK WILLIAM P)