Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0860635

EP0860635 - CYLINDER HEAD GASKET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.09.2006  [2006/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Taiho Kogyo Co., Ltd
65, Midorigaoka 3-chome Toyota-shi
Aichi 471-8671 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
TAIHO KOGYO CO., LTD.
65, Midorigaoka 3-chome Toyota-shi
Aichi 471-8671 / JP
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
TAIHO KOGYO CO., LTD.
65, Midorigaoka 3-chome Toyota-shi
Aichi 471 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAKUTA, Hirotaka
Taiho Kogyo Co., Ltd., 65, Midorigaoka 3-chome
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471 / JP
02 / SATO, Akio
Taiho Kogyo Co., Ltd., 65, Midorigaoka 3-chome
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471 / JP
03 / UCHIDA, Kenji
Taiho Kogyo Co., Ltd., 65, Midorigaoka 3-chome
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471 / JP
04 / NAKATA, Kazuya
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471 / JP
[1998/35]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/18]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [2003/28]Sanderson, Michael John , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [1998/35]Gura, Henry Alan , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date97933844.930.07.1997
[1998/35]
WO1997JP02645
Priority number, dateJP1996021782131.07.1996         Original published format: JP 21782196
[1998/35]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9804855
Date:05.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0860635
Date:26.08.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998
[1998/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0860635
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/08, F02F11/00
[1998/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/35]
TitleGerman:ZYLINDERKOPFDICHTUNG[1998/35]
English:CYLINDER HEAD GASKET[1998/35]
French:JOINT DE CULASSE[1998/35]
Entry into regional phase25.03.1998Translation filed 
20.04.1998National basic fee paid 
20.04.1998Search fee paid 
20.04.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
20.04.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/35]
04.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
02.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2005Fee for grant paid
13.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
22.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0642647
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940523), vol. 018, no. 269, Database accession no. (M - 1609), [X] 1 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH07332599  (KOATSU GAS HOAN KYOKAI);
 [Y]JPH07293700  (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD);
 [Y]JPH0373643U  ;
 [A]JPH0464777  (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD, et al)
by applicantJPH07293700