Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0871233

EP0871233 - NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/42]NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY CELL
[1999/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2000
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/42]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OMARU, Atsuo, Sony Energytec Inc.
1-1, Aza-Shimosugishita, Takakura, Hiwada-cho
Koriyama-shi, Fukushima-ken 963-05 / JP
02 / NAKAJIMA, Naoyuki, Sony Energytec Inc.
1-1, Aza-Shimosugishita, Takakura, Hiwada-cho
Koriyama-shi, Fukushima-ken 963-05 / JP
03 / NAGAMINE, Masayuki, Sony Energytec Inc.
1-1, Aza-Shimosugishita, Takakura, Hiwada-cho
Koriyama-shi, Fukushima-ken 963-05 / JP
[1998/42]
Representative(s)Müller, Frithjof E. , et al
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/42]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date97933851.430.07.1997
[1998/42]
WO1997JP02652
Priority number, dateJP1996020030430.07.1996         Original published format: JP 20030496
[1998/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9805083
Date:05.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0871233
Date:14.10.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998
[1998/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0871233
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/62, H01M4/58, H01M10/40
[1998/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/42]
TitleGerman:SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT NICHTWÄSSRIGEM ELEKTROLYTEN[1999/32]
English:NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY[1999/32]
French:BATTERIE ELECTROLYTIQUE SECONDAIRE NON AQUEUSE[1999/32]
Former [1998/42]NICHTWÄSSRIGE SEKUNDÄRE ELEKTROLYTISCHE ZELLE
Former [1998/42]NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY CELL
Former [1998/42]CELLULE ELECTROLYTIQUE SECONDAIRE NON AQUEUSE
Entry into regional phase24.03.1998Translation filed 
24.03.1998National basic fee paid 
24.03.1998Search fee paid 
24.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/42]
16.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
16.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.1999Fee for grant paid
22.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0704921  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,6-11,13,14 * column 10, lines 4-15 * * examples 1-6 * [Y] 12;
 [XY]EP0671774  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,6-10 * page 7, line 56 - page 8, line 6 * * page 19, lines 20-25 * * example 1 * [Y] 11-14;
 [XY]EP0651450  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,8-10,14 * page 10, lines 41-50 * * page 13, lines 40-46; example - * [Y] 11-13;
 [XY]EP0594965  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,8-10,14 * page 13, lines 20-29 * * example 1 * [Y] 11-13;
 [XY]EP0567149  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,8-10,14 * page 9, lines 37-46 * * example 1 * * page 13, lines 20-29 * [Y] 11-13;
 [X]JPH01294356
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900215), vol. 014, no. 082, Database accession no. (E - 0889), [X] 1,9,10 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH08195201  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD)