blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0914490

EP0914490 - CEMENTED CARBIDE INSERT FOR TURNING, MILLING AND DRILLING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2008
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sandvik Intellectual Property AB
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[N/P]
Former [2005/35]For all designated states
Sandvik Intellectual Property AB
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Former [2005/30]For all designated states
Sandvik Intellectual Property HB
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG
811 81 Sandviken / SE
Inventor(s)01 / WALDENSTRÖM, Mats
Thaliavägen 31
S-161 40 Bromma / SE
02 / ÖSTLUND, Ake
Sedelvägen 12
S-129 32 Hägersten / SE
03 / ALM, Ove
Storsvängen 136
S-129 44 Hägersten / SE
 [2007/36]
Former [2005/51]01 / WALDENSTRÖM, Mats
Thaliavägen 31
S-161 40 Bromma / SE
02 / ÖSTLUND, äke
Sedelvägen 12
S-129 32 Hägersten / SE
03 / ALM, Ove
Storsvängen 136
S-129 44 Hägersten / SE
Former [1999/19]01 / WALDENSTRÖM, Mats
Thaliavägen 31
S-161 40 Bromma / SE
02 / ÖSTLUND, ke
Sedelvägen 12
S-129 32 Hägersten / SE
03 / ALM, Ove
Storsvängen 136
S-129 44 Hägersten / SE
Representative(s)Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel
Sandvik AB
Patent Department
811 81 Sandviken / SE
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]Taquist, Lennart
Sandvik AB Patent Department
811 81 SANDVIKEN / SE
Application number, filing date97933943.908.07.1997
[1999/19]
WO1997SE01243
Priority number, dateSE1996000281119.07.1996         Original published format: SE 9602811
[1999/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9803691
Date:29.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0914490
Date:12.05.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0914490
Date:05.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE29.01.1998
ClassificationIPC:C22C29/08
[1999/19]
CPC:
C23C30/005 (EP,US); B22F1/00 (EP,US); B22F1/14 (EP,US);
C22C1/051 (EP,US); C22C29/08 (EP,US); B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US); Y10T428/252 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
B22F2998/00, B22F9/026 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1999/19]
TitleGerman:SINTERKARBIDEINSATZ ZUM DREHEN, FRÄSEN UND BOHREN[1999/19]
English:CEMENTED CARBIDE INSERT FOR TURNING, MILLING AND DRILLING[1999/19]
French:PLAQUETTE DE CARBURE FRITTE DESTINEE AU TOURNAGE, AU FRAISAGE ET AU PERçAGE[2005/15]
Former [1999/19]PLAQUETTE DE CARBURE FRITTE DESTINEE AU TOURNAGE, AU FRAISAGE ET AU PER AGE
Entry into regional phase15.12.1998National basic fee paid 
15.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
31.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
31.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/19]
19.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2005Fee for grant paid
13.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination27.09.2002Appeal received No.  T1151/02
08.11.2002Statement of grounds filed
04.11.2003Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Opposition(s)06.06.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XP]JP09125185  ;
 [A]JP03006349  ;
 [A]JP61124548  ;
 [X]US3660050  (ILER RALPH K, et al);
 [X]EP0240879  (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP]);
 [X]US4923512  (TIMM ED E [US], et al);
 [A]EP0476632  (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]);
 [X]  - "Tungsten Carbide-Base Cemented Carbide Used for Cutting Tool - Comprises Ha rd Phase Having Specified Particle Size Distribution and Contg. Tungsten Carbid", DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index, (19000101), Database accession no. 1995-057111/199508, XP002957575
 [XP]  - "Hard Tough Cemented Carbide - Comprises Mainly Tungsten Carbide, Cobalt and Nickel", DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index, (19000101), Database accession no. 1997-375632/199735, XP002957576 & JP09125185 A 00000000
 [A]  - "Sintered Hard Material for Water Jet or Wire Drawings Die Nozzles - Compris es Iron, Cobalt and/or Nickel, Carbide and/or Carbonitride of Gp-IVA Transition Meta", DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index, (19000101), Database accession no. 1997-149989/199714, XP002957577
 [A]  - "Coated sintered hard Alloy for Intermittent Cutting - Has Single or Multilayers of Ceramics on Matrix of Tungsten Carbide or Gp-IVA, Pg-VA or Gp-VIA Carbid", DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index, (19000101), Database accession no. 1991-227173/199131, XP002957578
 [A]  - "Super-Hard Alloy Prodn. - Comprises Hard Phase of Titanium-Carbide, Titaniu m-Nitride and Tungsten Carbide and Binder Phase of Iron-Gp. Metal", DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index, (19000101), Database accession no. 1991-055137/199108, XP002957579 & JP03006349 A 00000000
 [A]  - "Ultrafine Particles Sintered Hard Alloy - Comprises Tungsten Carbide Hard P hase Bonded with Iron and Chromium Gp Elements Contg. Carbide(s)", DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index, (19000101), Database accession no. 1986-192746/198630, XP002957580 & JP61124548 A 00000000
 [A]  - "Hard Alloy Useful for Cutting Tools Etc. Comprises Hard Phase Contg. Tungsten Carbide and Binder Metal Phase Contg. Iron-Gp. and Chromium-Gp. Elements", DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index, (19000101), Database accession no. 1986-178571/198628, XP002957581
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.