Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979555

EP0979555 - ANALOG INTERFACE CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.06.2001
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.07.2001 [2001/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sensorpulse Corp.
117 Eastman Street
South Easton, MA 02375 / US
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / ROACH, Kevin, V.
47 Fosdick Road
Carver, MA 02330 / US
02 / CALVIN, James, G.
239 Oak Street
Halifax, MA 02338 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Read, Matthew Charles , et al
Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date97933999.120.06.1997
[2000/07]
WO1997US10782
Priority number, dateUS1996066738621.06.1996         Original published format: US 667386
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9749187
Date:24.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/55]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979555
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1997
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:H03M1/00, H03M7/00
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/07]
TitleGerman:ANALOGE SCHNITTSTELLENSCHALTUNGEN[2000/07]
English:ANALOG INTERFACE CIRCUITS[2000/07]
French:CIRCUITS D'INTERFACE ANALOGIQUE[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase21.01.1999National basic fee paid 
21.01.1999Search fee paid 
21.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.01.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
01.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/30]
29.01.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200004   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5038365  (BELLOC JACQUES [FR], et al);
 [A]US5170387  (GROEN ROBERTUS W C [NL])