blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0917706

EP0917706 - ACTIVE STRUCTURAL CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD INCLUDING ACTIVE VIBRATION ABSORBERS (AVAs) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2003  [2003/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LORD CORPORATION
Crossroads Corporate Park
Building II
110 Corning Road
Suite 100
Cary, NC 27511 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/21]For all designated states
LORD CORPORATION
Crossroads Corporate Park, Building II, 110 Corning Road, Suite 100
Cary, NC 27511 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROSSETTI, Dino, J.
1038 Hillside Drive
Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US
02 / IVERS, Douglas, E.
103 Tulliallan Lane
Cary, NC 27511 / US
03 / NORRIS, Mark, A.
4816 Hollybrook Drive
Apex, NC 27502 / US
04 / HEATH, Michael, C.
114 Leisure Court
Cary, NC 27511 / US
05 / SOUTHWARD, Steve, C.
4117 Winding Oak Way
Apex, NC 27502 / US
[1999/21]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP
Essex Place
22 Rodney Road
Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/21]Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al
c/o Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road
Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB
Application number, filing date97934064.307.07.1997
[1999/21]
WO1997US11856
Priority number, dateUS1996069374207.08.1996         Original published format: US 693742
[1999/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9806089
Date:12.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0917706
Date:26.05.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0917706
Date:08.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.02.1998
ClassificationIPC:G10K11/178
[1999/21]
CPC:
G10K11/17854 (EP,US); G10K11/17857 (EP,US); G10K11/17883 (EP,US);
G10K2210/121 (EP,US); G10K2210/1281 (EP,US); G10K2210/129 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3026 (EP,US); G10K2210/3027 (EP,US); G10K2210/3051 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3211 (EP,US); G10K2210/501 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/21]
TitleGerman:AKTIVE STRUKTURELLE KONTROLLSYSTEME MIT AKTIVE SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFERN[2002/18]
English:ACTIVE STRUCTURAL CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD INCLUDING ACTIVE VIBRATION ABSORBERS (AVAs)[1999/21]
French:SYSTEME D'AJUSTAGE STRUCTUREL ACTIF ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE RECOURANT A DES AMORTISSEURS DYNAMIQUES[1999/21]
Former [1999/21]AKTIVE STRUKTURELLE KONTROLLSYSTEME MIT AKTIVE SHWINGUNGSDÄMPFERN
Entry into regional phase22.01.1999National basic fee paid 
22.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/21]
15.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2001Fee for grant paid
22.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5515444  (BURDISSO RICARDO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,11 * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 55; figure 1 * [Y] 5,12,17,19,22,23;
 [DY]WO9534769  (LORD CORP [US]) [DY] 5,12,17,19,22,23 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 34 *;
 [A]US5423658  (PLA FREDERIC G [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 18 *;
 [DA]WO9612121  (LORD CORP [US], et al);
 [A]US5386689  (BOZICH DANIEL J [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.