Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974156

EP0974156 - MICROTIP VACUUM FIELD EMITTER STRUCTURES, ARRAYS, AND DEVICES, AND METHODS OF FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.08.2005
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY
Office of Technology Transfer
110 21st Avenue South
850 Baker Building
P.O. Box 6009, Station B
Nashville, TN 37235 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
VANDERBILT UNIVERSITY
Office of Technology Transfer, 110 21st Avenue South, 850 Baker Building, P.O. Box 6009, Station B
Nashville, TN 37235 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KANG, Weng, Poo
1222 Spring Creek Drive
Nashville, TN 37209 / US
02 / DAVIDSON, Jimmy, Lee
219 River Oaks Road
Brentwood, TN 37027 / US
03 / KERNS, David, V., Jr.
6626 Brookmont Terrace
Nashville, TN 37205 / US
04 / HOWELL, Mickey E.
5007 East Calgary
Murfreesboro, TN 37129 / US
 [2004/42]
Former [2000/04]01 / KANG, Weng, Poo
1222 Spring Creek Drive
Nashville, TN 37209 / US
02 / DAVIDSON, Jimmy, Lee
219 River Oaks Road
Brentwood, TN 37027 / US
03 / KERNS, David, V., Jr.
6626 Brookmont Terrace
Nashville, TN 37205 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97934252.425.06.1997
[2000/04]
WO1997US12760
Priority number, dateUS19960020428P25.06.1996         Original published format: US 20428 P
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844529
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974156
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974156
Date:13.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01J9/02, H01J1/14, H01J1/30
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:STRUKTUREN, ANORDNUNGEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN MIT VAKUUM-FELDEMISSIONS-MIKROSPITZEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2000/04]
English:MICROTIP VACUUM FIELD EMITTER STRUCTURES, ARRAYS, AND DEVICES, AND METHODS OF FABRICATION[2000/04]
French:STRUCTURES, RESEAUX ET DISPOSITIFS A EMISSION DE CHAMP SOUS VIDE A MICRO-POINTE ET TECHNIQUES DE FABRICATION[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase25.01.1999National basic fee paid 
25.01.1999Search fee paid 
25.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.01.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
27.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
06.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2004Fee for grant paid
07.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.10.2004
BE13.10.2004
CH13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
SE13.01.2005
ES24.01.2005
[2007/17]
Former [2005/51]AT13.10.2004
BE13.10.2004
CH13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
ES24.01.2005
Former [2005/36]AT13.10.2004
CH13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
ES24.01.2005
Former [2005/27]CH13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
ES24.01.2005
Former [2005/25]CH13.10.2004
LI13.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4307507  (GRAY HENRY F, et al) [X] 1,23 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 35; figures 1-12 * [Y] 3,5,34,37;
 [Y]US5499938  (NAKAMOTO MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,5 * column 9, line 59; figures 1A-1D,4 *;
 [X]US5129850  (KANE ROBERT C [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,25,26 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 39; figures 4A-4D *;
 [Y]US5038070  (BARDAI ZAHER [US], et al) [Y] 34,37 * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 55; figures 3A-3F *
 [XY]  - KANG ET AL., "A novel low Field Electron Emission Polycrystalline Diamond Microtip Arrays for Sensor Applications", TRANSDUCERS '95. EUROSENSORS IX, Stockholm, (1995), vol. 2, page 182-185, XP002109377 [X] 1,3,4,23,24,26,33 * Summary, I.Introduction, II.Experimental method; page 182 - page 183; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,34,37

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SENSOR.1995.721775
International search[A]US4164680  (VILLALOBOS HUMBERTO F [US]);
 [Y]US4307507  (GRAY HENRY F, et al);
 [Y]US4851254  (YAMAMOTO MINORU [JP], et al);
 [YP]US5580827  (AKAMINE SHINYA [US]);
 [Y]US5270258  (YOSHIDA MASAHIRO [JP]);
 [A]US4964946  (GRAY HENRY F [US], et al);
 [Y]US5038070  (BARDAI ZAHER [US], et al);
 [Y]US5126287  (JONES GARY W [US]);
 [X]US5129850  (KANE ROBERT C [US], et al);
 [Y]US5138237  (KANE ROBERT C [US], et al);
 [Y]US5202571  (HIRABAYASHI KEIJI [US], et al);
 [Y]US5221221  (OKANIWA KAZUHIRO [JP]);
 [Y]US5438343  (KHAN BABAR A [US], et al);
 [Y]US5354714  (BOYSEL R MARK [US]);
 [A]US5249340  (KANE ROBERT C [US], et al)
 [X]  - KANG et al., "Pattern Polycrystalline Diamond Microtip Vacuum Diode Arrays", From the Book of Papers Titled, "Applications of Diamond Films and Related Materials", THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, 1995, Edited by A. FELDMAN et al., pages 37-40.,
 [Y]  - VAN DER WEIDE et al., "Schottky Barrier Height and Negative Electron Affinity of Titanium on (111) Diamond", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, July/August 1992, Vol. 10, No. 4, pages 1940-1943.,