Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0918371

EP0918371 - ANISOTROPIC CONDUCTIVE FILM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2008
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi
Osaka 567-8680 / JP
[2007/47]
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi
Osaka 567 / JP
Former [1999/21]For all designated states
NITTO DENKO CORPORATION
1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi
Osaka 567 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HOTTA, Yuji, Nitto Denko Corporation
1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome, Ibaraki-shi
Osaka 567 / JP
02 / MOCHIZUKI, Amane, Nitto Denko Corporation
1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome, Ibaraki-shi
Osaka 567 / JP
 [2007/47]
Former [2007/46]01 / HOTTA, Yuji, Nitto Denko Corporation
1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome, Ibaraki-shi
Osaka 567 / JP
02 / MOCHIZUKI, Amane, Nitto Denko Corporation
1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome, Ibaraki-shi
Osaka 567 / JP
Former [1999/21]01 / HOTTA, Yuji., Nitto Denko Corporation
1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome, Ibaraki-shi
Osaka 567 / JP
02 / MOCHIZUKI, Amane., Nitto Denko Corporation
1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome, Ibaraki-shi
Osaka 567 / JP
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/21]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date97934721.806.08.1997
[1999/21]
WO1997JP02750
Priority number, dateJP1996020954208.08.1996         Original published format: JP 20954296
JP1997011724407.05.1997         Original published format: JP 11724497
[1999/21]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9807216
Date:19.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0918371
Date:26.05.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998
[1999/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0918371
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01R11/00, H01R43/00, H01B5/16, H01R13/24
[2000/03]
Former International [1999/21]H01R11/00, H01R43/00, H01B5/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1999/21]
TitleGerman:ANISOTROPISCHE, LEITENDE FOLIE UND IHR HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[1999/21]
English:ANISOTROPIC CONDUCTIVE FILM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME[1999/21]
French:FILM CONDUCTEUR ANISOTROPE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[1999/21]
Entry into regional phase04.02.1999Translation filed 
04.02.1999National basic fee paid 
04.02.1999Search fee paid 
04.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
04.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/21]
19.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2007Fee for grant paid
29.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
28.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL14.11.2007
[2008/25]
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0469798  (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3,6-18 * page 3, column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 14; figures 1,12-14 *;
 [Y]DE2520590  (TECH WIRE PROD INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-18 * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 8; figures 7-9 *;
 [A]US3852878  (MUNRO G) [A] 1-18 * abstract *
International search[X]JPS61292866
 [X]JPS63266783
 [Y]JPS6188407
 [Y]JPH06203657
 [Y]JPH07312246
 [Y]JPH05152021
 [Y]JPS63502786