Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0917901

EP0917901 - FIRE-RETARDANT FILTER MEDIUM AND AIR FILTER UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/21]For all designated states
DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED
Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / INOUE, Osamu, Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP
02 / CHAEN, Shinichi, Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP
03 / URAOKA, Nobuki, Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd.,1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP
04 / KUSUMI, Toshio, Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP
05 / ASANO, Jun, Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP
06 / HIRANO, Seiichi, Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP
07 / HARA, Satoshi, Yodogawa-seisakusho
Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya
Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP
[1999/21]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2002/32]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [1999/21]Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr.
Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10
50389 Wesseling / DE
Application number, filing date97934724.206.08.1997
[1999/21]
WO1997JP02755
Priority number, dateJP1996021163709.08.1996         Original published format: JP 21163796
JP1997002152304.02.1997         Original published format: JP 2152397
[1999/21]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9806476
Date:19.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0917901
Date:26.05.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998
[1999/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0917901
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Search report(s)International search reportJP19.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP01.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B01D39/00, B01D39/16, B01D39/08, B32B5/26, B32B33/00, E04B9/02
[2001/16]
Former International [1999/21]B01D39/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/21]
TitleGerman:FEUERHEMMENDES FILTERMEDIUM UND LUFTFILTEREINHEIT[1999/21]
English:FIRE-RETARDANT FILTER MEDIUM AND AIR FILTER UNIT[1999/21]
French:MILIEU FILTRANT RESISTANT AU FEU ET FILTRE A AIR[1999/21]
Entry into regional phase11.02.1999Translation filed 
11.02.1999National basic fee paid 
11.02.1999Search fee paid 
11.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
11.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/21]
02.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2004Fee for grant paid
15.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
21.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.06.2004
BE02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
IT02.06.2004
IE06.08.2004
DK02.09.2004
GR02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
PT02.11.2004
[2008/08]
Former [2005/46]AT02.06.2004
BE02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
IE06.08.2004
DK02.09.2004
GR02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2005/22]AT02.06.2004
BE02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
DK02.09.2004
GR02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2005/14]AT02.06.2004
BE02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
GR02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2005/11]AT02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
GR02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2005/06]FI02.06.2004
GR02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI02.06.2004
ES13.09.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US5418054  (SUN KWOK K [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, lines 35-40 * * example 1 *;
 [X]US4302496  (DONOVAN JAMES G) [X] 1,2,4 * column W *;
 [X]WO9015713  (GORE & ASS [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * example . *
International search[A]JPS51134475  (JAPAN VILENE CO LTD);
 [A]JPH05504717  ;
 [A]JPH05184844  (DAIKIN IND LTD);
 [A]JPH0368409  (GORE & ASS)