Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021226

EP1021226 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CATALOGUING MULTIMEDIA DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.08.2004  [2004/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Survivors of the Shoah Visual History Foundation
P.O. Box 3168
Los Angeles, CA 90078-3168 / US
[2000/30]
Inventor(s)01 / GUSTMAN, Samuel
1338 14th Street 201
Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Hitching, Peter Matthew
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date97934887.708.07.1997
[2000/30]
WO1997US11811
Priority number, dateUS1996068050408.07.1996         Original published format: US 680504
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9801850
Date:15.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1021226
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998
[2000/30]
Search report(s)International search reportUS25.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:A63B69/00, G06F17/30
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [2000/30]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KATALOGISIERUNG MULTIMEDIADATEN[2000/30]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CATALOGUING MULTIMEDIA DATA[2000/30]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CATALOGAGE DE DONNEES MULTIMEDIA[2000/30]
Entry into regional phase03.02.1999National basic fee paid 
03.02.1999Search fee paid 
03.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.02.1999Examination requested  [2000/30]
03.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/35]
17.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9416398  (PAGE CHRISTOPHER ROBERT [GB]) [A] 1,3,27,30 * page 16, line 12 - page 18, line 18; figures 4,5 *;
 [PA]JPH08235198  ;
 [DA]US5414644  (SEAMAN GARY W [US], et al) [DA] 25 * abstract *;
 [DA]EP0196064  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,13,27,30 * page 19, line 10 - page 22, line 11; figures 2,3 *
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 097, no. 001, [PA] 1,13,27,30 * abstract *
International search[AP]US5608900  (DOCKTER MICHAEL J [US], et al);
 [AP]US5617119  (BRIGGS ROBERT [US], et al);
 [AP]US5615112  (LIU SHENG OLIVIA R [US], et al);
 [XP]US5630121  (BRADEN-HARDER LISA C [US], et al);
 [AP]US5630125  (ZELLWEGER PAUL [US])