Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000353

EP1000353 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR MEASURING TOTAL POLAR COMPOUNDS IN DEGRADING OILS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/47]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul
Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ONWUMERE, Fidelis, C.
1759 Sheffield Drive
Woodbury, MN 55125 / US
02 / PRANIS, Robert, A.
654 Short Street
Saint Paul, MN 55106 / US
03 / TRUONG, Jack, G.
P.O. Box 28310
Saint Paul, MN 55128 / US
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/20]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97935140.028.07.1997
[2000/20]
WO1997US13168
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9905519
Date:04.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1000353
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000353
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/03
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2000/20]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR MESSUNG DER GESAMTEN POLAREN BESTANDTEILE IN GEBRAUCHTEM ÖL[2005/46]
English:METHODS AND DEVICES FOR MEASURING TOTAL POLAR COMPOUNDS IN DEGRADING OILS[2000/20]
French:PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS DE MESURE DE LA QUANTITE TOTALE DE COMPOSES POLAIRES DANS DU PETROLE EN DECOMPOSITION[2000/20]
Former [2000/20]METHODEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER GESAMTEN POLAREN BESTANDTEILEN IN GEBRAUCHTEN ÖL
Entry into regional phase18.02.2000National basic fee paid 
18.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
26.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2005Fee for grant paid
03.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.11.2005
BE23.11.2005
CH23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
SE23.02.2006
[2006/36]
Former [2006/34]AT23.11.2005
CH23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
SE23.02.2006
Former [2006/33]CH23.11.2005
LI23.11.2005
SE23.02.2006
Former [2006/27]SE23.02.2006
Cited inInternational search[DA]US4349353  (BLUMENTHAL MICHAEL M, et al) [DA] 1-58 * abstract * * column 3, line 11 - line 63 *;
 [A]EP0165061  (OIL PROCESS SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-58 * abstract * * page 4, line 27 - page 6, line 7 *;
 [DA]US2953439  (ELLIOTT WILLIAM E, et al) [DA] 1-58 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 6 *