blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0918543

EP0918543 - POLYMER COMPOSITION FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF PEPTIDES AND PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/22]PROTEIN-CONTAINING POLYMER COMPOSITION FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION
[2003/47]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orex Pharmaceutical Development Corp.
501 Marford Drive
St. Louis, MO 63141 / US
[1999/22]
Inventor(s)01 / PLATE, Nikolai A.
ul. Zelinskogo, 38-95
Moscow, 117334 / RU
02 / VALUEV, Lev I.
pr. Lokomotivny, 9-a-48
Moscow, 127238 / RU
03 / VALUEVA, Tatyana A.
pr. Lokomotivny, 9-a-48
Moscow, 127238 / RU
04 / STAROSELTSEVA, Ludmila K.
pr. 40 Let Oktjabrja, 15-9
Moscow, 109382 / RU
05 / AMETOV, Alexander S.
ul. akad. Koreleva, 3-a-90
Moscow, 129515 / RU
06 / KNYAZHEV, Vladimir A.
Sokolnichesky val, 40-103
Moscow, 107113 / RU
07 / HENIS, Jay, M., S.
501 Marford Drive
St. Louis, MO 63141 / US
[1999/38]
Former [1999/22]01 / PLATE, Nikolai A.
ul. Zelinskogo, 38-95
Moscow, 117334 / RU
02 / VALUEV, Lev I.
pr. Lokomotivny, 9-a-48
Moscow, 127238 / RU
03 / VALUEVA, Tatyana A.
pr. Lokomotivny, 9-a-48
Moscow, 127238 / RU
04 / STAROSELTSEVA, Ludmila K.
pr. 40 Let Oktjabrja, 15-9
Moscow, 109382 / RU
05 / AMETOV, Alexander S.
ul. akad. Koreleva, 3-a-90
Moscow, 129515 / RU
06 / KNYAZHEV, Vladimir A.
Sokolnichesky val, 40-140
Moscow, 107113 / RU
07 / HENIS, Jay, M., S.
501 Marford Drive
St. Louis, MO 63141 / US
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al
Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date97935194.730.07.1997
[1999/22]
WO1997US13352
Priority number, dateUS1996069161702.08.1996         Original published format: US 691617
[1999/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9805362
Date:12.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0918543
Date:02.06.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0918543
Date:21.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.05.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61K47/32
[2003/47]
CPC:
A61K47/32 (EP); A61K47/42 (EP); A61K47/46 (EP)
Former IPC [1999/22]A61K47/48
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/22]
TitleGerman:POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ORALEN ADMINISTRATION VON PEPTIDEN UND PROTEINEN[2003/47]
English:POLYMER COMPOSITION FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF PEPTIDES AND PROTEINS[2003/47]
French:COMPOSITION POLYMERE POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE PEPTIDES ET PROTEINES A VOIE ORALE[2003/47]
Former [1999/22]PROTEIN-ENTHALTENDE POLYMER ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ORALE ABGABE
Former [1999/22]PROTEIN-CONTAINING POLYMER COMPOSITION FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION
Former [1999/22]COMPOSITION POLYMERE A CONTENU PROTEIQUE POUR UNE ADMINISTRATION ORALE
Entry into regional phase23.01.1999National basic fee paid 
23.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/22]
13.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2004Fee for grant paid
19.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI21.04.2004
NL21.04.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
LU30.07.2004
PT21.09.2004
[2008/08]
Former [2006/13]FI21.04.2004
NL21.04.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
LU30.07.2004
Former [2005/23]FI21.04.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
LU30.07.2004
Former [2005/06]FI21.04.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/02]FI21.04.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2004/52]SE21.07.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0098110  (JAPAN CHEM RES [JP]) [A] 1-13 * page 5; claims 1-3 ** page 3 *;
 [YD]US5049545  (LOEBERMANN HARTMUT [DE], et al) [YD] 1-9 * abstract * * column 2, lines 10-24; examples 3-6; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5359030  (EKWURIBE NNOCHIRI N [US]) [A] 1-13 * columns 8-9; claims 20,23,31-33 * * columns 11-12; examples 4,5,7 *;
 [A]WO9515352  (UNIV QUEBEC MONTREAL [CA]) [A] 1-13 * page 24; table 2 * * page 25 - page 26; figure 6; claims 3,4,13,15 *;
 [XDY]DE19510551  (INST NEFTECHIMICHESKOGO SINTEZ [RU], et al) [XD] 1-13 * the whole document * * page 4, lines 20-25; claim 15 * [Y] 1-13;
 [PX]RU2076733  (INST NEFTECHIMICHESKOGO SINTEZ [RU]) [PX] 1-13 * abstract * * column 3, paragraphs 4-6; examples 1-5 *;
 [Y]  - VALUEV L I ET AL, "IMMOBILIZATION OF OVOMUCOID ON DEXTRANS", POLYMER SCIENCE, (19920101), vol. 34, no. 11, pages 972 - 974, XP000336191 [Y] 1-13 * page 974; table 1 * * page 972, column 1 *
 [Y]  - VALUEV L I ET AL, "INTERACTION OF POLYMERIC DERIVATIVES OF TRYPSIN WITH ITS PROTEIN INHIBITOR", POLYMER SCIENCE: SERIE A, (19950901), vol. 37, no. 9, pages 910 - 914, XP000540705 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 910, column 2 *
 [A]  - KOPECEK J. ET AL, "Polymers for colon-specific drug delivery", J. CONTROL. RELEASE, 1992, 19/1-3 (121-130), NETHERLANDS, XP002057830 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 123 * * page 127 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(92)90070-8
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.