Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0985450

EP0985450 - EXHAUST GAS CLEANING CATALYST METAL HONEY COMB ELEMENT AND ITS MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Steel Corporation
6-3 Otemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-71 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION
6-3 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-71 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OOTANI, Tadayuki
Nippon Steel Corporation Nagoya Works
5-3, Tokaimachi Tokai City Aichi 476 / JP
02 / IMAI, Atuhiko
Nippon Steel Corporation Nagoya Works
5-3, Tokaimachi Tokai City Aichi 476 / JP
03 / KASUYA, Masayuki
Nippon Steel Corporation Nagoya Works
5-3, Tokaimachi Tokai City Aichi 476 / JP
04 / IWAMI, Kazutoshi
Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP
05 / UTUMI, Tooru
Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP
06 / YAMANAKA, Mikio, Nippon Steel Corporation
Technical Development Bureau, 20-1, Shintomi
Futtsu City Chiba 299-12 / JP
07 / OHTA, Hitoshi
Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-71 / JP
08 / TOKUNAGA, Yoshikuni
Nippon Steel Corporation Nagoya Works
5-3, Tokaimachi Tokai City Aichi 476 / JP
09 / SHIMIZU, Fujio Nippon Steel Corporation
Nagoya Works
5-3, Tokaimachi Tokai City Aichi 476 / JP
10 / EGAMI, Toshihiro
Nippon Steel Corporation Nagoya Works
5-3, Tokaimachi Tokai City Aichi 476 / JP
11 / NODA, Tamio
Nippon Steel Corporation Nagoya Works
5-3, Tokaimachi Tokai City Aichi 476 / JP
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date97935795.115.08.1997
[2000/11]
WO1997JP02842
Priority number, dateJP1997011991409.05.1997         Original published format: JP 11991497
JP1997011991509.05.1997         Original published format: JP 11991597
JP1997012093112.05.1997         Original published format: JP 12093197
JP1997014822305.06.1997         Original published format: JP 14822397
[2000/11]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9851410
Date:19.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0985450
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0985450
Date:23.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:B01J35/04, B21D47/00, B23K20/14, F01N3/28, B32B3/12
[2000/23]
Former International [2000/11]B01J35/04, B32B3/12, B21D47/00, B23K20/14, B23K20/18, B23K101/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/11]
TitleGerman:KATALYTISCHER METALLWABENKÖRPER ZUR ABGASREINIGUNG UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2000/11]
English:EXHAUST GAS CLEANING CATALYST METAL HONEY COMB ELEMENT AND ITS MANUFACTURE[2000/11]
French:ELEMENT EN NID D'ABEILLES METALLIQUE CATALYTIQUE POUR LA PURIFICATION DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT, ET SA FABRICATION[2000/11]
Entry into regional phase09.11.1999Translation filed 
07.12.1999National basic fee paid 
07.12.1999Search fee paid 
07.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
07.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/11]
21.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.09.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
21.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2003Fee for grant paid
15.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02016258.2  / EP1293649
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT23.04.2003
SE23.07.2003
[2008/08]
Former [2003/41]SE23.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0636411  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
International search[XP]JPH09215932  (NIPPON STEEL CORP);
 [X]JPH0822380B  ;
 [Y]JPH0999218  (NIPPON STEEL CORP);
 [X]JP2521839Y  ;
 [Y]JPH08108077  (NIPPON STEEL CORP);
 [A]JPH08332394  (CALSONIC CORP);
 [A]JPH0976035  (NIPPON STEEL CORP)