Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0916200

EP0916200 - TESTING FACILITY FOR A BROADBAND COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCIENTIFIC-ATLANTA, INC.
One Technology Parkway South, Box 105600
Atlanta, GA 30348 / US
[1999/20]
Inventor(s)01 / RITCHIE, John, A., Jr.
2610 Willow Green Drive
Duluth, GA 30136 / US
02 / DUBBERLY, Gregory, T.
6777 Jones Chapel Court
Atlanta, GA 30360 / US
03 / IDLER, Steve
701 Timberline Drive
Bolingbrook, IL 60440 / US
[1999/20]
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/20]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date97936093.018.07.1997
[1999/20]
WO1997US12504
Priority number, dateUS1996069062831.07.1996         Original published format: US 690628
[1999/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9805138
Date:05.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0916200
Date:19.05.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998
[1999/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0916200
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04H1/02, H04N17/00
[1999/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/20]
TitleGerman:PRÜFUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR BREITBAND FERNMELDESYSTEM[1999/20]
English:TESTING FACILITY FOR A BROADBAND COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM[1999/20]
French:EQUIPEMENT DE TEST POUR UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS A LARGE BANDE[1999/20]
Entry into regional phase19.02.1999National basic fee paid 
19.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.02.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
19.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/20]
06.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
28.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
18.05.2000Fee for grant paid
18.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
02.08.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)21.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9527350  (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [A] 1,19,28,33 * page 1, line 1 - page 16, line 6; figures 1-3; claims 1,13,26 *;
 [A]WO9508228  (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [A] 1,19,28,33 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 4; figures 1-3; claims 1,22-26 *;
 [A]JPS62183641
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880126), vol. 12, no. 26, Database accession no. (E - 577), [A] 1,19,28,33 * abstract *