Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047543

EP1047543 - CONTAINERS WITH IMPROVED CREASE-CRACK RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.05.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.07.2003  [2003/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CONTINENTAL PLASTIC CONTAINERS, INC.
301 Merritt 7 Corporate Park, P.O. Box 5410
Norwalk, CT 06856 / US
[2000/44]
Inventor(s)01 / FEHN, Gregory, M.
930 Lakewood Drive
Barrington, IL 60010 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Goodenough, Nigel
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Goodenough, Nigel
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date97936484.122.07.1997
[2000/44]
WO1997US14127
Priority number, dateUS1996068541323.07.1996         Original published format: US 685413
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9803327
Date:29.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1047543
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998
[2000/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.01.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B29D22/00, B32B1/02, B65D1/02, B65D23/02
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTER MIT VERBESSERTEM FALTRISSWIDERSTAND[2000/44]
English:CONTAINERS WITH IMPROVED CREASE-CRACK RESISTANCE[2000/44]
French:RECIPIENTS A RESISTANCE AMELIOREE AUX FISSURES SE FORMANT AU NIVEAU DES PLIURES[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase27.09.1999National basic fee paid 
27.09.1999Search fee paid 
27.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/44]
06.01.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.01.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
15.02.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
19.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/29]
17.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
18.08.1999M01   Fee paid on   27.09.1999
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199903   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1999
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE8807824U  (HENKEL) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10,14,15 * claim 1 * [Y] 3,4,7,8,12,17;
 [Y]US4567069  (JABARIN SALEH A [US]) [Y] 3,4,7,8,12,17 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0339413  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 11,13,16,18 * claim 1 *
International search[A]US4616766  (MIYAUCHI OTOHIKO [JP], et al);
 [A]US4824618  (STRUM WILLIAM L [US], et al)