Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979428

EP0979428 - CO-AXIAL HOLLOW CORE WAVEGUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rutgers, The State University of New Jersey
ASB Annex II, Bevier Road, P.O. Box 1179
Piscataway, NJ 08855-1179 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
RUTGERS, THE STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW JERSEY
ASB Annex II, Bevier Road, P.O. Box 1179
Piscataway, NJ 08855-1179 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HARRINGTON, James, A.
1074 Mayflower Court
Martinsville, NJ 08836 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/07]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97936488.208.08.1997
[2000/07]
WO1997US14200
Priority number, dateUS1996073011608.08.1996         Original published format: US 730116
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9805985
Date:12.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979428
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1998
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/20
[2000/16]
Former International [2000/07]G02B6/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:KOAXIALER HOHLWELLENLEITER[2000/07]
English:CO-AXIAL HOLLOW CORE WAVEGUIDE[2000/07]
French:GUIDE D'ONDE CREUX COAXIAL[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase26.02.1999National basic fee paid 
26.02.1999Search fee paid 
26.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.02.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
21.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/15]
09.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.199903   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.1999
31.08.200307   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.2004
31.08.200408   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9519580  (UNIV RUTGERS [US]) [X] 1,15,23,27,29 * the whole document *;
 [X]  HARRINGTON J A ET AL, "FIBER OPTICS FOR 3 AND 10 MICRON MEDICAL LASERS", LEOS. IEEE LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS SOCIETY ANNUAL MEETING,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1995), vol. CONF. 8, ISBN 0-7803-2451-X, pages 153 - 154, XP000622202 [X] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LEOS.1995.484811
International search[X]US5395480  (BHARDWAJ POONAM [US], et al);
 [Y]US4778249  (WORRELL CLIVE A [GB]);
 [Y]US4930863  (CROITORIU NATAN [IL], et al);
 [Y]US4372648  (BLACK PHILIP W [GB])