blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0921946

EP0921946 - CYLINDER DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft
Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4
97080 Würzburg / DE
[1999/24]
Inventor(s)01 / HAUER, Horst-Walter
Leutfresserweg 10
D-97082 Würzburg / DE
[1999/24]
Application number, filing date97936583.001.08.1997
[1999/24]
WO1997DE01632
Priority number, dateDE199613229209.08.1996         Original published format: DE 19632292
DE199614841322.11.1996         Original published format: DE 19648413
[1999/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9806581
Date:19.02.1998
Language:DE
[1998/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0921946
Date:16.06.1999
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0921946
Date:10.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/19]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0921946
Date:31.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.02.1998
ClassificationIPC:B41F13/004
[1999/24]
CPC:
B41F13/0045 (EP,US); B41P2213/126 (EP,US); B41P2213/25 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1999/24]
TitleGerman:ZYLINDERANTRIEB[1999/24]
English:CYLINDER DRIVE[1999/24]
French:ENTRAINEMENT DE CYLINDRE[1999/24]
Entry into regional phase23.02.1999National basic fee paid 
23.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/24]
03.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2000Fee for grant paid
25.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.02.2001  06.03.2002  WITHDRAWN
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Postfach 10 00 96
86135 Augsburg / DE
 [2008/30]
Former [2001/14]
Opponent(s)01  08.02.2001   
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG
Stadtbachstr. 1 Postfach 10 00 96
86135 Augsburg / DE
22.03.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.07.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2002Reply to a communication from the opposition division
27.03.2003Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.03.2003Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.04.2003Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.11.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
23.01.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[YA]DE4126129  (KBA PLANETA AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 5;
 [AD]DE4138479  (BAUMUELLER NUERNBERG GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * figure 7 *;
 [AD]DE4422097  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [AD] 1* figure 1 *;
 [DY]DE4430693  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [DY] 1-3 * figures 33,34 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 21 *
OppositionCH452288
 EP0669208
 DE4429460
 DE19646135
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.