EP0936933 - BALLOON CATHETER WITH OCCLUDED SEGMENT BYPASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delcath Systems, Inc. 1100 Summer Street Stamford, CT 06905 / US | For all designated states Glickman, Morton G. 112 Huntington Street New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [1999/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLICKMAN, Morton, G. 112 Huntington Street New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Wasmeier, Alfons, et al Patentanwälte Graf Wasmeier Glück Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Wasmeier, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Wasmeier & Graf Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97937266.1 | 28.07.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997US14348 | Priority number, date | US19960708046 | 30.08.1996 Original published format: US 708046 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9808558 | Date: | 05.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936933 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0936933 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, A61M29/00 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
A61M25/1011 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1052 (EP,US);
A61M2025/1095 (EP,US);
A61M25/0075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/34] | Title | German: | BALLONKATHETER MIT EINEM EIN VERSCHLUSSEGMENT BEINHALTENDEN BYPASS | [1999/34] | English: | BALLOON CATHETER WITH OCCLUDED SEGMENT BYPASS | [1999/34] | French: | CATHETER A BALLONNETS COMPORTANT UNE DERIVATION DE SEGMENT PRESENTANT UNE OCCLUSION | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 25.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 19.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 11.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Request for further processing for: | 02.12.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 02.12.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.12.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2000 | 31.07.2005 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2006 | CH | 15.03.2006 | FI | 15.03.2006 | LI | 15.03.2006 | NL | 15.03.2006 | DK | 15.06.2006 | GR | 16.06.2006 | ES | 26.06.2006 | IE | 28.07.2006 | LU | 28.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | PT | 16.08.2006 | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
IE | 28.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CH | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
LI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5364376 (HORZEWSKI MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,7* column A; figures 1,2,4,6 * | International search | [A]US4573966 (WEIKL ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [A]US4636195 (WOLINSKY HARVEY [US]); | [X]US5135484 (WRIGHT JOHN T M [US]); | [A]US5135474 (SWAN KENNETH G [US], et al); | [Y]US5178608 (WINTERS R EDWARD [US]); | [A]US5312344 (GRINFELD ROBERTO R [AR], et al); | [Y]US5360403 (MISCHE HANS A [US]); | [A]US5460610 (DON MICHAEL T ANTHONY [US]) |