Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0931009

EP0931009 - ARRANGEMENT FOR CONVEYING THICK MATTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2001
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.07.2001 [2001/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PUTZMEISTER Aktiengesellschaft
Max-Eyth-Strasse 10
72631 Aichtal / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/30]For all designated states
PUTZMEISTER Aktiengesellschaft
Max-Eyth-Strasse 10
72631 Aichtal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BACHNER, Ernst
Wastl-Witt-Strasse 60
D-80689 München / DE
[1999/30]
Representative(s)Wolf, Eckhard
Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB
Tübinger Strasse 26
70178 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/30]Wolf, Eckhard, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93
70193 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date97937561.508.08.1997
[1999/30]
WO1997EP04314
Priority number, dateDE199614117408.10.1996         Original published format: DE 19641174
[1999/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9815482
Date:16.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0931009
Date:28.07.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1998
[1999/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0931009
Date:19.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.04.1998
ClassificationInternational:B65G53/32, F17D1/12, // F17D3/08
[1999/30]
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT [1999/30]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUR WEITFÖRDERUNG VON DICKSTOFFEN[1999/30]
English:ARRANGEMENT FOR CONVEYING THICK MATTER[1999/30]
French:SYSTEME POUR ACHEMINER DES LIQUIDES[1999/30]
Entry into regional phase26.11.1998National basic fee paid 
26.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/30]
12.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
14.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2000Fee for grant paid
21.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US4373225  (V ECKARDSTEIN KARL-ERNST [DE], et al) [A] 1-10;
 [A]GB2162142  (LILLEY JOSEPH HOWARD) [A] 1-11;
 [A]US3811248  (LESK A, et al) [A] 1-11;
 [A]DE4203571  (THERMOZELL ENTWICKLUNGS UND VE [AT]) [A] 1-11