blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0918791 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0918791



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 315
22.12.2011 Decision to limit the patent Limitation procedure 1
16.12.2011 Closure of limitation/revocation proceedings Limitation procedure 1
13.12.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Limitation procedure 1
02.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Limitation procedure 2
02.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Limitation procedure 2
02.12.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Limitation procedure 1
02.12.2011 Request for change of name of the applicant Limitation procedure 69
07.10.2011 Annex to the communication Limitation procedure 1
07.10.2011 Annex to the communication on the allowance of the limitation Limitation procedure 1
07.10.2011 Communication on the allowance of the limitation of the European patent Limitation procedure 3
07.10.2011 Druckexemplar in limitation procedure Limitation procedure 9
07.10.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Limitation procedure 1
15.09.2011 Annex to the communication Limitation procedure 1
15.09.2011 Annex to the communication Limitation procedure 1
15.09.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Limitation procedure 1
15.09.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Limitation procedure 1
31.08.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (limitation procedure) Limitation procedure 1
26.08.2011 Request for extension of time limit Limitation procedure 1
24.08.2011 Request for extension of time limit Limitation procedure 1
24.06.2011 Annex to the communication - Limitation Limitation procedure 1
24.06.2011 Report regarding the limitation procedure Limitation procedure 1
26.05.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Limitation procedure 1
19.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Limitation procedure 1
19.05.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Limitation procedure 3
19.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Limitation procedure 1
19.05.2011 Request for change of name - applicant Limitation procedure 1
17.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Limitation procedure 1
17.05.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Limitation procedure 1
17.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Limitation procedure 1
17.05.2011 Request for change of name - applicant Limitation procedure 1
13.05.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Limitation procedure 1
06.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Limitation procedure 2
06.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Limitation procedure 9
06.05.2011 Claims Limitation procedure 12
06.05.2011 Document concerning representation Limitation procedure 2
06.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Limitation procedure 1
06.05.2011 Letter/request relating to the limitation procedure Limitation procedure 3
06.05.2011 Request for limitation/revocation Limitation procedure 3
07.02.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
15.01.2003 Correction to published European patent application/patent specification Search / examination 2
27.09.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
23.09.2002 Request for change of name Search / examination 10
21.02.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.01.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.01.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.01.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
08.01.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.01.2002 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.01.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
08.01.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
18.12.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 15
18.09.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
01.09.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.07.2001 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
03.07.2001 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
08.03.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.03.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.03.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
13.12.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 49
04.08.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.12.1998 Claims Search / examination 1
04.12.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.12.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
11.05.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.02.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
19.02.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 16
19.02.1998 Priority document Search / examination 14