blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0918791


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.12.2011 (Expected) limited patent specification published on  18.01.2012  [2012/03]
07.12.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for limitation of patent
04.11.2011 New entry: Reply to communication from examining division in limitation procedure + time limit
07.10.2011 Request for limitation of patent allowed: despatch of communication published on  09.11.2011  [2011/45]
29.08.2011 Change: Despatch of communication from examining division in limitation procedure + time limit
20.06.2011 New entry: communication from examining division procedure + time limit
20.05.2011 Request for limitation of patent admissible published on  22.06.2011  [2011/25]
09.05.2011 New entry: Request for limitation filed
09.01.2009 Change - divisional application(s) published on  11.02.2009  [2009/07]
07.02.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.03.2003  [2003/13]
22.11.2002 Correction of patent specification published on  08.01.2003  [2003/02]
27.09.2002 Change - name/address published on  13.11.2002  [2002/46]
15.02.2002 (Expected) grant published on  03.04.2002  [2002/14]
08.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.09.2001 Communication of intention to grant
13.09.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.08.2001 Change - divisional application(s) published on  04.10.2001 [2001/40]
03.08.2001 Change - divisional application(s) published on  19.09.2001 [2001/38]
25.07.2001 Renewal fee
05.03.2001 Communication of intention to grant
11.01.2001 Examination report or reply
04.08.2000 First examination report
01.08.2000 Examination report or reply
01.08.2000 Renewal fee
29.07.1999 Renewal fee
16.04.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.06.1999 [1999/22]
16.04.1999 Request for examination filed published on  02.06.1999 [1999/22]
14.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.1999 Change - extension states
15.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
04.05.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
24.02.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.1997 PCT data prior to European publication