blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0918791 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP01250277 EP01250278 EP09100011 EP97937562



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3333524BGlobal Dossier 15.10.2002B2
JP2000516226 05.12.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2168974Global Dossier 02.07.2014B1
EP2168974 06.03.2013A3
EP2168974 31.03.2010A2
Priority number Date
EP01250277 11.08.1997
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP97937562 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1149841Global Dossier 28.10.2009B1
EP1149841 01.12.2004A3
EP1149841 31.10.2001A2
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP97937562 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1149840Global Dossier 15.05.2013B2
EP1149840 07.01.2009B1
EP1149840 01.12.2004A3
EP1149840 31.10.2001A2
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP97937562 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0918791Global Dossier 18.01.2012B3
EP0918791 08.01.2003B8
EP0918791 03.04.2002B1
EP0918791 02.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT215557T 15.04.2002T
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU729149B 25.01.2001B2
AU4014497 06.03.1998A
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BG62776B 31.07.2000B1
BG102976 31.08.1999A
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9711060 17.08.1999A
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2261137 15.03.2005C
CA2261137 19.02.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59706887D 08.05.2002D1
Priority number Date
DE59706887 11.08.1997
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0918791T 15.07.2002T3
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK1149840T 30.09.2013T5
DK1149840T 01.07.2013T4
DK1149840T 27.04.2009T3
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK1149841T 08.03.2010T3
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP97937562 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2168974T 11.08.2014T3
Priority number Date
EP01250277 11.08.1997
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA001947 22.10.2001B1
EA199900153 24.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1021190 04.03.2005A1
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU223106 29.03.2004B1
HU9903089 30.07.2001A3
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL127963 20.06.2004A
IL127963D 30.11.1999D0
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IS2100B 12.04.2006B
IS4965 29.01.1999A
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ333697 25.08.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL187474B 30.07.2004B1
PL331530 19.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI0918791T 31.12.2002T1
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
EP97937562 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI1149840T 30.08.2013T2
SI1149840T 30.06.2009T1
Priority number Date
EP01250277 11.08.1997
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI1149841T 26.02.2010T1
Priority number Date
EP01250278 11.08.1997
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SK283546B 11.09.2003B6
SK19499 08.10.1999A3
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6121465 19.09.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6933395 23.08.2005B1
Priority number Date
US64074800 18.08.2000
DE19633685 12.08.1996
EP9704342 11.08.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9806738Global Dossier 19.02.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT420098T 15.01.2009T
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT446966T 15.11.2009T
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1158300C 21.07.2004C
CN1223662 21.07.1999A
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ297255 11.10.2006B6
CZ47099 12.05.1999A3
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19633685 09.10.1997C1
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE59712991D 26.02.2009D1
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE59713018D 10.12.2009D1
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2175451T 19.11.2012T7
ES2175451T 16.11.2002T3
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2320626T 05.09.2013T5
ES2320626T 27.05.2009T3
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2335860T 06.04.2010T3
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2438941T 21.07.2014T3
ES2438941T 20.01.2014T1
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100473297B 07.03.2005B1
KR20000029939 25.05.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT918791E 30.09.2002E
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT1149840E 31.03.2009E
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT1149841E 29.01.2010E
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2168974E 26.08.2014E
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TR199900262T 22.03.1999T2
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
UA55423 15.04.2003C2
Priority number Date
DE19633685 12.08.1996
TypeType Divisional application
 EP1149840
 EP1149841
 EP2168974