blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0918791

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 MC 
 NL 
 PT 
 SE 
Examination procedure18.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase04.12.1998National basic fee paid 
04.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted03.04.2002
Opposition procedure06.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit published on 26.03.2003 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:02.06.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:02.06.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL PAYMENT 19981204;LT PAYMENT 19981204;LV PAYMENT 19981204;RO PAYMENT 19981204;SI PAYMENT 19981204
 
Event date:02.06.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19981204
 
Event date:20.09.2000 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000804
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:03.04.2002 
Event description:LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION
 
Event date:03.04.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:03.04.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL PAYMENT 19981204;LT PAYMENT 19981204;LV PAYMENT 19981204;RO PAYMENT 19981204;SI PAYMENT 19981204
 
Event date:03.04.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:215557
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20020415
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:15.04.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:08.05.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59706887
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20020508
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:15.05.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:GERMAN
 
Event date:15.07.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:31.07.2002 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20020705
 
Event date:30.08.2002 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:06.09.2002 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:30.09.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20020701
 
Event date:09.10.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20020402367 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:13.11.2002 
Event description:PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED
Owner Name:SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
 
Event date:16.11.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2175451 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:26.03.2003 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20030106
 
Event date:10.01.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SI IF
Code Expl.:+VALID ON THE PRS DATE
 
Event date:18.12.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE APPLICATION FILED
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:L20060017
 
Event date:26.02.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT ND9D
Code Expl.:+FILING A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: DROSPIRENONUM; REG.NO/DATE: LT/1/06/0520/001-004 10060710
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:PA 2006 009
Filing DATE:20061229
 
Event date:26.02.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT SPCF
Code Expl.: FILING AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: DROSPIRENONUM; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: LT/1/06/0520/001, 2006 07 10 LT/1/06/0520/002, 2006 07 10 LT/1/06/0520/003, 2006 07 10 LT/1/06/0520/004 20060710; FIRST REGISTRATION: RVG 31781 20050804
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:PA2006009
Filing DATE:20061229
Expiry DATE:20170811
 
Event date:25.07.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT SPCR
Code Expl.:-REJECTION OF AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: DROSPIRENONUM; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: LT/1/06/0520/001, 2006 07 10 LT/1/06/0520/002, 2006 07 10 LT/1/06/0520/003, 2006 07 10 LT/1/06/0520/004 20060710; FIRST REGISTRATION: RVG 31781 20050804
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:PA2006009
Filing DATE:20061229
Expiry DATE:20170811
Effective DATE:20080207
 
Event date:15.09.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Free Format Text:SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#MUELLERSTRASSE 178 POSTFACH 650311#13342 BERLIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#MUELLERSTRASSE 178#13353 BERLIN (DE)
 
Event date:31.12.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SI SP73
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER
Owner Name:BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT; DE
Effective DATE:20091118
 
Event date:01.02.2010 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1
Owner Name:BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
 
Event date:19.03.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
 
Event date:19.03.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CA
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF ADDRESS
 
Event date:23.03.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT QB4A
Code Expl.: LICENCE
Name of Requester:BAYER PORTUGAL, S.A., PT
Effective DATE:20100312
 
Event date:22.04.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CL
Code Expl.: CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES
 
Event date:06.05.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R055 59706887 DE
Code Expl.:-PATENTEE'S LIMITATION REQUEST RECEIVED BY EPO
 
Event date:22.06.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR LIMITATION FOUND ADMISSIBLE
Free Format Text:SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED AFTER OPPOSITION PERIOD
Filing DATE:20110506
 
Event date:07.10.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 59706887 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:25.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES PC2A
Code Expl.:+TRANSFER OF PATENT
Owner Name:BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Effective DATE:20111115
 
Event date:29.12.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R056 59706887 DE
Code Expl.:-PATENT LIMITED BY EPO AT PATENTEE'S REQUEST
Effective DATE:20111007
 
Event date:31.01.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH AEN
Code Expl.: MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT
Free Format Text:BESCHRAENKUNGANTRAG GUTGEHEISSEN
 
Event date:18.04.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:24.04.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE REB3
Code Expl.:+PATENT HAS BEEN LIMITED BY THE EPO
Effective DATE:20120118
 
Event date:16.05.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL TD
Code Expl.: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS
Effective DATE:20120508
 
Event date:08.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
Owner Name:BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE
Effective DATE:20120502
 
Event date:18.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20120400860 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20120518
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Free Format Text:BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#MUELLERSTRASSE 178#13353 BERLIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#MUELLERSTRASSE 178#13353 BERLIN (DE)
 
Event date:02.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59706887 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 13353 BERLIN, DE
Effective DATE:20120612
 
Event date:19.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI SPCL
Code Expl.:-WITHDRAWAL, REJECTION OR DISMISSAL OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:L20060017
 
Event date:15.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT HC 215557 AT T
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS
Owner Name:BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE
Effective DATE:20121018
 
Event date:06.02.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT QB4A
Code Expl.: LICENCE
Name of Requester:LUSAL, PRODUCAO QUIMICO-FARMACEUTICA LUSO-ALEM, PT
Effective DATE:20130128
 
Event date:06.02.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT QB4A
Code Expl.: LICENCE
Name of Requester:BERLEX - ESPECIALIDADES FARMACEUTICAS, LDA. (B, PT
Effective DATE:20130128
 
Event date:08.08.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES GD2A
Code Expl.: CONTRACTUAL LICENCES
Effective DATE:20130808
 
Event date:23.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20160801
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20160810
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20160802
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20160809
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20160809
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20160810
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20160726
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20160810
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20160822
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20160812
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20160725
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20160729
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20160727
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20160809
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20160811
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20160725
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20160728
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:11.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 59706887 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:15.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:18.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20170810
 
Event date:30.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20170810
 
Event date:03.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:15.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK07 215557 AT T
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY
Effective DATE:20170811
 
Event date:18.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MK9A
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED
 
Event date:20.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20170811
 
Event date:24.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20171124
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20170810
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20170811
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20170821
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20170812