Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0918791

EP0918791 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING DROSPIRENONE AND INTERMEDIATES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been limited
Status updated on  16.12.2011
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2011(Expected) limited patent specificationpublished on 18.01.2012  [2012/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
[2012/03]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Schering Aktiengesellschaft
Patente Müllerstrasse 178, Postfach 65 03 11
13342 Berlin / DE
Former [1999/22]For all designated states
Schering Aktiengesellschaft Patente
Müllerstrasse 178, Postfach 65 03 11
13342 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MOHR, Jörg-Thorsten
Zwinglistrasse 4
D-10555 Berlin / DE
02 / NICKISCH, Klaus
Zescher Strasse 14
D-12307 Berlin / DE
[1999/22]
Representative(s)Bertucco, Alberto
Bayer Schering Pharma AG
Patents & Licensing
Müllerstraße 178
DE-13342 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/03]Bertucco, Alberto
Bayer Schering Pharma AG Patents & Licensing Müllerstraße 178
DE-13342 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date97937562.311.08.1997
[1999/22]
WO1997EP04342
Priority number, dateDE199613368512.08.1996         Original published format: DE 19633685
[1999/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9806738
Date:19.02.1998
Language:DE
[1998/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0918791
Date:02.06.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998
[1999/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0918791
Date:03.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/14]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP0918791
Date:08.01.2003
[2003/02]
Type: B3 Limited patent 
No.:EP0918791
Date:18.01.2012
Language:DE
[2012/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07J53/00
[1999/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/22]
Extension statesAL04.12.1998
LT04.12.1998
LV04.12.1998
RO04.12.1998
SI04.12.1998
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DROSPIRENON UND ZWISCHENPRODUKTE DAVON[1999/22]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING DROSPIRENONE AND INTERMEDIATES THEREOF[1999/22]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE DROSPIRENONE ET LEUR INTERMEDIAIRES[1999/22]
Entry into regional phase04.12.1998National basic fee paid 
04.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/22]
04.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2001Fee for grant paid
18.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01250277.9  / EP1149840
EP01250278.7  / EP1149841
EP09100011.7  / EP2168974
Opposition(s)06.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13]
Limitations:06.05.2011Date of receipt of request for limitation
 admissible
07.10.2011Communication of intention to limit the patent
02.12.2011Fee for printing patent specification after limitation
24.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
23.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0075189  (SCHERING AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * examples G,H *;
 [Y]EP0051143  (SCHERING AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * page 10; examples G,H *;
 [Y]WO9014344  (GAF CHEMICALS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - D. BITTLER ET AL, "Synthesis of Spirorenone - A Novel Highly Active Aldosterone Antagonist", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION., WEINHEIM DE, (1982), vol. 21, no. 9, pages 696 - 697, XP002047531 [X] 2 * page 696, column 2; figure 1 * [Y] 1-3

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.198206961