blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0919074

EP0919074 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ITT Manufacturing Enterprises, Inc.
1105 North Market Street Suite 1217
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]For all designated states
ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC.
1105 North Market Street, Suite 1217
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HALLER, Wolfgang
Haldenweg 2
D-71409 Schwaikheim / DE
02 / KIENINGER, Hans
Goldbergstrasse 45B
D-70327 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/22]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date97937566.412.08.1997
[1999/22]
WO1997EP04373
Priority number, dateDE199613290516.08.1996         Original published format: DE 19632905
[1999/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9808277
Date:26.02.1998
Language:DE
[1998/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0919074
Date:02.06.1999
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0919074
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.02.1998
ClassificationIPC:H01R13/703
[1999/22]
CPC:
H01R13/641 (EP,US); H01R2103/00 (EP,US); H01R24/38 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/22]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHE STECKVERBINDUNG[1999/22]
English:ELECTRICAL CONNECTION[1999/22]
French:CONNEXION ELECTRIQUE[1999/22]
Entry into regional phase28.01.1999National basic fee paid 
28.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/22]
16.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.1999Fee for grant paid
18.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US2909615  (NICHOLAS FRANTZ);
 [AD]US5334025  (FOEHL ARTUR [DE]);
 [A]EP0701927  (THOMAS & BETTS CORP [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.