Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0957160

EP0957160 - METHOD FOR INDUCING IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVE CELLS AND CULTURING DEVICE TO BE USED THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/12]For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
Former [1999/46]For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMASHITA, Kenji
877-10, Yoneda, Yoneda-cho
Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676 / JP
02 / FUKUCHI, Takeshi
Room 304, Sezon Asagiri, 123, Asagiri-cho 3-chome
Akashi-shi, Hyogo 673 / JP
03 / NISHINO, Tomoko
246-1-803, Gochaku, Mikunino-cho
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-02 / JP
 [2005/38]
Former [2005/36]01 / YAMASHITA, Kenji
877-10, Yoneda, Yoneda-cho
Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676 / JP
02 / FUKUCHI, Takeshi
Room 304, Sezon Asagiri, 123, Asagiri-cho 3-chome
Akashi-shi, Hyogo 673 / JP
03 / NISHINO, Tomoko
246-1-803, Gochaku, Mikunino-cho
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-02 / JP
Former [1999/46]01 / YAMASHITA, Kenji
877-10, Yoneda, Yoneda-cho
Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676 / JP
02 / FUKUCHI, Takeshi
Room 304, Sezon Asagiri, 123, Asagiri-cho 3-chome
Akashi-shi, Hyogo 673 / JP
03 / NISHINO, Tomoko
246-1-803, Gochaku, Mikunino-cho
Hmeji-shi, Hyogo 671-02 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1999/46]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97937835.329.08.1997
[1999/46]
WO1997JP03016
Priority number, dateJP1996023331603.09.1996         Original published format: JP 23331696
[1999/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9810055
Date:12.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0957160
Date:17.11.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998
[1999/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0957160
Date:22.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.03.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/00, C12M1/00, C12M1/22, C12M1/24, C12N5/06, C12M3/00
[2003/23]
Former International [1999/46]C12N5/00, C12M1/00, C12M1/22, C12M1/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1999/46]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR INDUZIERUNG VON IMMUNSUPPRIMIERTEN ZELLEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZU DEREN KULTIVIERUNG[2005/36]
English:METHOD FOR INDUCING IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVE CELLS AND CULTURING DEVICE TO BE USED THEREFOR[1999/46]
French:METHODE D'INDUCTION DE CELLULES IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVES ET DISPOSITIF DE CULTURE UTILISE A CETTE FIN[2005/38]
Former [1999/46]VERFAHREN ZUR INDUZIERUNG VON IMMUNSUPPREMIERTEN ZELLEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZU DEREN KULTIVIERUNG
Former [1999/46]METHODE D'ACTIVATION DE CELLULES IMMUNOSUPPRESSIVES ET DISPOSITIF DE CULTURE UTILISE A CETTE FIN
Entry into regional phase01.04.1999Translation filed 
01.04.1999National basic fee paid 
01.04.1999Search fee paid 
01.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
01.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/46]
12.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2005Fee for grant paid
13.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB29.08.2006
[2008/08]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0421380  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 15-18 * page 3, line 26; claim 1 *;
 [X]  - NGUYEN DUY D ET AL, "Anti-CD3-induced anergy in cloned human Th-0, Th-1, and Th-2 cells.", CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 165, no. 1, ISSN 0008-8749, pages 153 - 157, XP002238164 [X] 1-18 * page 154, column 1, line 23 - line 33 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cimm.1995.1199
 [X]  - WOLF HANS ET AL, "Induction of anergy in resting human T lymphocytes by immobilized anti-CD3 antibodies.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 24, no. 6, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 1410 - 1417, XP009008993 [X] 1-18 * page 1413, column 1, line 21 - line 26; figure 2; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830240626
 [X]  - HORWITZ JOSEPH I ET AL, "Immobilized IL-2 preserves the viability of an IL-2 dependent cell line.", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 1041 - 1048, XP009008994 [X] 15-18 * page 1024, column 1, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(93)90129-Y
 [PX]  - CHAI J G ET AL, "Immobilized anti-CD3 mAb induces anergy in murine naive and memory CD4+ T cells in vitro.", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY. ENGLAND JUL 1997, (199707), vol. 9, no. 7, ISSN 0953-8178, pages 935 - 944, XP009008992 [PX] 1-18 * page 936, column 2, line 19 - line 22; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/intimm/9.7.935
International search[Y]  - PATHOBIOLOGY, Vol. 63, (1995), JIXUM LIN et al., "CD3 and CD2 Ligation Alters CD49d Epitopoe Expression", pages 119-132.
 [Y]  - IMMUNOLOGY, Vol. 68, (1989), R.A.W. VAN LIER et al., "Immobilized Anti-CD3 Monoclonal Antibodies Induce Accessory Cell-Independent Lymphokine Production, Proliferation and Helper Activity in Human T Lymphocytes", pages 45-50.
 [Y]  - CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, Vol. 115, (1988), PAUL ANDERSON et al., "Crosslinking CD3 with CD2 Using Sepharose-Immobilized Antibodies Enhances T Lymphocyte Proliferation", pages 246-256.
 [Y]  - CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, Vol. 72, (1982), RAYMOND P. DONNELLY et al., "Immunossuppression Induced by Staphylococcal Enterotoxin B", pages 166-177.
 [Y]  - BIOCHEMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, Vol. 1124, (1994), BEVERLY Z. PACKARD et al., "Bone Marrow Activation by Immobilized Antibodies Against Tumor Cells and Immunocytes as a Potential Cancer Immunotherapy", pages 395-400.