Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048380

EP1048380 - AUTOMATIC LATHE AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2002  [2002/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD.
1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome, Nishitokyo-shi
Tokyo 188-8511 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/47]For all designated states
Citizen Watch Co. Ltd.
1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome, Nishitokyo-shi
Tokyo 188-8511 / JP
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD.
1-1 Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo 163-04 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SHINOHARA, Hiroshi, Citizen Watch Co., Ltd.
840, Aza-Takeno, Oaza-Shimotomi
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359 / JP
02 / NAKAYA, Takaichi, Citizen Watch Co., Ltd.
840, Aza-Takeno, Oaza-Shimotomi
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359 / JP
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Prüfer, Lutz H. , et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte
Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date97937846.029.08.1997
[2000/44]
WO1997JP03028
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911408
Date:11.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1048380
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1048380
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search reportJP11.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP19.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23B3/16, B23Q11/00
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/44]
TitleGerman:DREHAUTOMAT UND DESSEN VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG[2000/44]
English:AUTOMATIC LATHE AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING SAME[2000/44]
French:TOUR AUTOMATIQUE ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE CE DERNIER[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase29.02.2000Translation filed 
28.02.2000National basic fee paid 
28.02.2000Search fee paid 
28.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
29.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
29.02.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
28.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.12.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
07.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.10.2001Fee for grant paid
02.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0059494  (HEMBRUG GEREEDSCHAPSWERKTUIGEN [NL]) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 20 - line 32 * * page 5, line 14 - line 23 * * page 6, line 8 - line 28 * * figures 1,3-5 *;
 [A]EP0598386  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 7, line 8 - line 35 * * column 8, line 21 - line 26 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US5007314  (HAFLA DIETMAR F [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 28; figure - *;
 [A]GB1411705  (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 81 - page 3, line 79; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US4180894  (LINK HELMUT F [DE]) [A] 3,6 * column 3, line 30 - line 47; figures 1,4 *
International search[A]JPH0739069B  ;
 [A]JPH0319747  (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP);
 [A]JPH02284847  (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD);
 [A]JPH03136745  (HITACHI SEIKI KK)