blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1026096

EP1026096 - CLOSING MECHANISM FOR AN OPENING OF A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hagihara, Tadashi
Dai 2 Sukaihaitsu 606, 120, Saiwai-cho Nishimbashi Matsudo-shi
Chiba-ken 271 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
Hagihara, Tadashi
Dai 2 Sukaihaitsu 606, 120, Saiwai-cho Nishimbashi
Matsudo-shi, Chiba-ken 271 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/32]
Representative(s)Merkau, Bernhard
Glawe Delfs Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Liebherrstrasse 20
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]Merkau, Bernhard
c/o Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Liebherrstrasse 20 Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date97937867.602.09.1997
[2000/32]
WO1997JP03057
Priority number, dateJP1997015077609.06.1997         Original published format: JP 15077697
[2000/32]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9856672
Date:17.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1026096
Date:09.08.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:B65D33/38
[2000/32]
CPC:
B65D5/746 (EP,US); B65D33/00 (KR); B65D33/30 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/32]
TitleGerman:SCHLIESSMECHANISMUS FÜR EINE BEHÄLTERÖFFNUNG[2000/32]
English:CLOSING MECHANISM FOR AN OPENING OF A CONTAINER[2000/32]
French:MECANISME DE FERMETURE POUR L'ORIFICE D'UN RECIPIENT[2000/32]
Entry into regional phase08.12.1999Translation filed 
08.12.1999National basic fee paid 
08.12.1999Search fee paid 
08.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
08.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/32]
12.09.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
22.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
21.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
20.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
11.01.200003   M06   Fee paid on   05.06.2000
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS4732508Y  ;
 [A]JPS6068036U  ;
 [A]JPS61193042U  ;
 [A]JPH0216664Y  ;
 [A]JPH0752958  (S P CHEM KK)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.