Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976064

EP0976064 - AN AUTOMATED MAINTENANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.03.2003  [2003/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fetherston, Denis
18 Hamish Place
Pakuranga, Auckland 1706 / NZ
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Powell, Timothy John
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/29]Powell, Timothy John
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2000/05]MacGregor, Gordon
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date97937916.129.08.1997
[2000/05]
WO1997NZ00106
Priority number, dateNZ1996028639329.08.1996         Original published format: NZ 28639396
NZ1997032855915.08.1997         Original published format: NZ 32855997
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9811477
Date:19.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976064
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU16.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, G06F17/60
[2001/44]
Former International [2000/05]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISIERTES WARTUNGSVERFAHREN[2000/07]
English:AN AUTOMATED MAINTENANCE SYSTEM[2000/05]
French:SYSTEME DE GESTION AUTOMATISE[2000/05]
Former [2000/05]AUTOMATISIERTESWARTUNGSVERFAHREN
Entry into regional phase18.03.1999National basic fee paid 
18.03.1999Search fee paid 
18.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
18.03.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
01.02.2000Observations by third parties
02.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/13]
24.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.09.200105   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2001
31.08.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No Search
International search[X]US4864497  (LOWRY EDWARD S [US], et al)