blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979519

EP0979519 - IMPROVED STRUCTURE FOR LAMINATED SUPERCONDUCTING CERAMIC COMPOSITE CONDUCTORS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2008
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.03.2008  [2008/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORPORATION
Two Technology Drive
Westborough, MA 01581 / US
[2007/13]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORPORATION
Two Technology Drive
Westborough, MA 01581 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GAMBLE, Bruce, B.
14 Pinewood Road
Wellesley, MA 02181 / US
02 / RILEY, Gilbert, N., Jr.
630 Hemenway Street
Marlborough, MA 01752 / US
03 / SCUDIERE, John, D.
200 Annie Moore Road
Bolton, MA 01740 / US
04 / MANLIEF, Michael, D.
26 Stevens Street
Westborough, MA 01581 / US
05 / BUCZEK, David, M.
81 Tisdale
Dover, MA 02030 / US
06 / SNITCHLER, Gregory, L.
64 Ireta Road
Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Jones, David Colin
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Jones, David Colin
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date97938157.106.08.1997
[2000/07]
WO1997US13891
Priority number, dateUS1996070133330.08.1996         Original published format: US 701333
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9809296
Date:05.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979519
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979519
Date:28.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.03.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2002
ClassificationIPC:H01B12/02, H01L39/14, H01L39/24
[2006/42]
CPC:
H10N60/203 (EP,US); H10N60/0801 (EP,US); Y10S428/93 (EP,US);
Y10S505/704 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/07]H01B12/02, H01L39/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/07]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE STRUKTUR FÜR LAMINIERTE SUPRALEITENDE KERAMISCHE VERBUNDLEITER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2006/42]
English:IMPROVED STRUCTURE FOR LAMINATED SUPERCONDUCTING CERAMIC COMPOSITE CONDUCTORS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE[2000/07]
French:STRUCTURE AMELIOREE DE CONDUCTEURS COMPOSITES, CERAMIQUES, SUPRACONDUCTEURS ET STRATIFIES, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2000/07]
Former [2000/07]VERBESSERTE STRUKTUR FÜR LAMINIERTE SUPRALEITENDE KERAMISCHE VERBUNDLEITERN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN
Entry into regional phase19.03.1999National basic fee paid 
19.03.1999Search fee paid 
19.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.03.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
08.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2007Fee for grant paid
12.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH01276511  ;
 JPH01276511  [ ] (HOKURIKU ELECTRIC POWER, et al) [ ] * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0375353  (GEN ATOMICS [US]) [X] 1-28 * column 4, line 46 - column 13, line 39; figure - *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900126), vol. 014, no. 045, Database accession no. (E - 0880), & JP01276511 A 19891107 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD ET AL) [X] 1,7-9,14,21-25 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH03110806  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD, et al);
 [A]US5104849  (SHIGA SHOJI [JP], et al);
 [A]US5151406  (SAWADA KAZUO [JP], et al);
 [A]US5312802  (HAYASHI NORIKI [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.