EP0921748 - FILTER FOR A WET/DRY VACUUM CLEANER FOR WET MATERIAL COLLECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark Delaware 19714-9206 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, Delaware 19714-9206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCANLON, John, J. 1308 North Hillside Boulevard Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | 02 /
WNENCHAK, Raymond, M. 92 West Mill Station Drive Newark, DE 19711 / US | 03 /
GIANNETTA, Richard, W. 2139 Appleton Road Elkton, MD 21921 / US | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | McCallum, William Potter, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | McCallum, William Potter, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 97938418.7 | 20.08.1997 | [1999/24] | WO1997US14566 | Priority number, date | US19960701142 | 21.08.1996 Original published format: US 701142 | [1999/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9807361 | Date: | 26.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0921748 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0921748 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47L7/00 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
A47L7/0028 (EP,US);
A47L7/0042 (EP,US);
Y10S55/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/24] | Title | German: | FILTER FÜR NASS-TROCKENSAUGER ZUM SAMMELN VON FEUCHTEM SCHMUTZ | [2000/42] | English: | FILTER FOR A WET/DRY VACUUM CLEANER FOR WET MATERIAL COLLECTION | [1999/24] | French: | FILTRE POUR ASPIRATEUR DE LIQUIDES/POUSSIERES PERMETTANT DE RECUEILLIR DES DECHETS HUMIDES | [1999/24] |
Former [1999/24] | FILTER FÜR NASS-TROCKENSAUFER ZUM SAMMELN VON FEUCHTEM SCHMUTZ | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 09.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3405749 (DUEPRO AG [CH]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, lines 17-28 * * page 5, lines 9-27 * * page 6, column 25 - page 7, column 11 *; | [A]EP0607058 (BOSYJ NICK M [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0500420 (BACOT DOMINIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 43 - column 5, line 12 * * column 5, lines 34-40; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3775951 (EICHOLZ A, et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, lines 4-11 - lines 55-60 * * column 2, lines 31-66 * * column 3, lines 22-47; figures 2,4 * |