Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0920743

EP0920743 - SYMBOL-MATCHED FILTER HAVING A LOW SILICON AND POWER REQUIREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2006
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 03.05.2006  [2006/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.
Suite 190, 185 Route 36
West Long Branch, NJ 07764 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]For all designated states
Golden Bridge Technology, Inc.
Suite 190, 185 Route 36
West Long Branch, NJ 07764 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TRAN, Jimmy, Cuong
18 Overlook Drive
Jackson, NJ 08527 / US
02 / DAVIDOVICI, Sorin
Apartment 6A, 35-38 75th Street
Jackson Heights, NY 11372 / US
[1999/23]
Representative(s)Rupprecht, Kay , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/23]Rupprecht, Kay, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date97938473.220.08.1997
[1999/23]
WO1997US14675
Priority number, dateUS1996070144022.08.1996         Original published format: US 701440
[1999/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9808313
Date:26.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0920743
Date:09.06.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998
[1999/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0920743
Date:30.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/707, H03H17/02
[2000/04]
Former International [1999/23]H04B1/707
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1999/23]
TitleGerman:SYMBOLANGEPASSTER FILTER MIT NIEDRIGEM SILIZIUM- UND LEISTUNGSBEDARF[1999/23]
English:SYMBOL-MATCHED FILTER HAVING A LOW SILICON AND POWER REQUIREMENT[1999/23]
French:FILTRE DE SYMBOLES ADAPTE A FAIBLES BESOINS EN ENERGIE ET EN SILICIUM[1999/23]
Entry into regional phase18.01.1999National basic fee paid 
18.01.1999Search fee paid 
18.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/23]
31.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.12.2004Fee for grant paid
30.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
30.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE01.07.2005
[2006/18]
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[AP]US5627855  (DAVIDOVICI SORIN [US]);
 [A]US5293398  (HAMAO NORIYUKI [JP], et al);
 [A]US4441194  (KINGSTON SAMUEL C [US], et al)
ExaminationEP0652650