Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0948389

EP0948389 - HOLLOW, MULTI-DIMENSIONAL ARRAY MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MedArray, Inc.
1610 Harbal Drive
Ann Arbor, Michigan 48105 / US
[2000/41]
Former [1999/41]For all designated states
Michigan Critical Care Consultants, Inc.
Suite J, 245 Jackson Industrial Drive
Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MONTOYA, Jean, P.
1610 Harbal Drive
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
[1999/41]
Representative(s)Solf, Alexander , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Solf, Alexander, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Former [1999/41]Solf, Alexander, Dr.
Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date97938526.725.08.1997
[1999/41]
WO1997US14796
Priority number, dateUS1996070338126.08.1996         Original published format: US 703381
[1999/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9808591
Date:05.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0948389
Date:13.10.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998
[1999/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.03.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/22, A61M1/20, B01D63/02, B01D69/08
[2000/02]
Former International [1999/41]B01D53/22, A61M1/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1999/41]
TitleGerman:HOHLE, MEHRDIMENSIONALE MEMBRANANORDNUNG[1999/41]
English:HOLLOW, MULTI-DIMENSIONAL ARRAY MEMBRANE[1999/41]
French:MEMBRANE SE COMPOSANT D'UN RESEAU D'ELEMENTS CREUX MULTIDIMENSIONNEL[1999/41]
Entry into regional phase03.03.1999National basic fee paid 
03.03.1999Search fee paid 
03.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/41]
03.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/39]
02.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4622206  (TORGESON WILLIAM L [US]) [A] 1-35 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 11 * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 40; figures 1,14-16 *
International search[A]US3445321  (GROVES JAMES N);
 [A]US3794468  (LEONARD R);
 [A]US4022692  (JANNECK HOWARD A);
 [A]US4213858  (BOBERG NILS G E [SE], et al);
 [A]US4911846  (AKASU HIROYUKI [JP], et al);
 [A]US5002666  (MATSUMOTO NORIYA [JP], et al);
 [A]US5043140  (COMBS RICHARD C [US]);
 [A]US5162101  (COSENTINO LOUIS C [US], et al);
 [A]US5188801  (FINI MASSIMO [IT]);
 [A]US5230862  (BERRY GAYLORD [US], et al);
 [A]US5297591  (BAURMEISTER ULRICH [DE]);
 [A]US5312589  (REEDER GARY D [US], et al);
 [A]US5489413  (CARSON GARY A [US], et al);
 [AP]US5565166  (WITZKO RICHARD [DE], et al);
 [A]JPH0330889  (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS);
 [A]JPH03135422  (UBE INDUSTRIES)