Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9911396 | Global Dossier | 11.03.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN9700092 | 04.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100504356B | Global Dossier | 28.07.2005 | B1 | KR20010023650 | 26.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | CN9700092 | 04.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU750839B | Global Dossier | 01.08.2002 | B2 | AU4110397 | 22.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CN9700092 | 04.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1020237 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2004 | B1 | EP1020237 | 16.04.2003 | A4 | EP1020237 | 19.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN9700092 | 04.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE282485T | 15.12.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CN9700092 | 04.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9714856 | 25.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | BR9714856 | 04.09.1997 | CN9700092 | 04.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2302424 | 14.11.2006 | C | CA2302424 | 11.03.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN9700092 | 04.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29780450U | 04.05.2000 | U1 | Priority number | Date | CN9700092 | 04.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69731671T | 01.12.2005 | T2 | DE69731671D1 | 23.12.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CN9700092 | 04.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2198750 | 20.02.2003 | C2 | Priority number | Date | CN9700092 | 04.09.1997 |