Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020237

EP1020237 - A MILL FOR ROLLING STRIPS OR PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.09.2005
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zheng, Hongzhuan
Building 3, 14 Jingqi Road Zhengzhou City
Henan Province 450002 / CN
For all designated states
Zhao, Linzhen
Building 3, 14 Jingqi Road Zhengzhou City
Henan Province 450002 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Zheng, Hongzhuan
Building 3, 14 Jingqi Road
Zhengzhou City, Henan Province 450002 / CN
For all designated states
Zhao, Linzhen
Building 3, 14 Jingqi Road
Zhengzhou City, Henan Province 450002 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Sparing Röhl Henseler
Postfach 14 04 43
40074 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys
Postfach 14 04 43
40074 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/29]Sparing - Röhl - Henseler Patentanwälte
Postfach 14 04 43
40074 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date97938744.604.09.1997
[2000/29]
WO1997CN00092
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911396
Date:11.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020237
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020237
Date:17.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:B21B13/02, B21B31/07, B21B13/14
[2003/16]
Former International [2000/29]B21B13/02, B21B31/07
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU [2000/29]
TitleGerman:WALZWERK ZUM WALZEN VON BÄNDERN ODER BLECHEN[2000/29]
English:A MILL FOR ROLLING STRIPS OR PLATES[2000/29]
French:LAMINOIR POUR FEUILLARDS OU PRODUITS PLATS[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase23.03.2000Translation filed 
23.03.2000National basic fee paid 
23.03.2000Search fee paid 
23.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN
23.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
22.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2004Fee for grant paid
25.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6360004  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-25 * figure 3 *
International search[Y]GB379584  (WITKOWITZER BERGB GEWERKSCHAFT, et al);
 [Y]US2279350  (AARON SIMONS);
 [Y]US1910148  (BUCKWALTER TRACY V);
 [X]CN2084397U  (QINGDAO BUILDING ENGINEERING C [CN]);
 [Y]US2181173  (GENE CATULLE);
 [A]US3762202  (SHERWOOD W)