blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0925599

EP0925599 - ENERGY FILTER, TRANSMISSION ELECTRON MICROSCOPE AND ASSOCIATED METHOD FOR FILTERING ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.04.2002
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.06.2002  [2002/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE
3, rue Michel Ange
75016 Paris Cédex / FR
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
3 rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cédex 16 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / JOUFFREY, Bernard
5, rue de Martignac
F-75007 Paris / FR
02 / HEBERT-SOUCHE, Cécile
Wohlmuthgasse 18
A-3003 GABLITZ / AT
[2000/06]
Former [1999/26]01 / JOUFFREY, Bernard
5, rue de Martignac
F-75007 Paris / FR
02 / SOUCHE, Cécile
52, avenue de Paris
F-78000 Versailles / FR
Representative(s)Michelet, Alain, et al
Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP
14-16, rue Ballu
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/26]Michelet, Alain, et al
Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date97938977.203.09.1997
[1999/26]
WO1997FR01555
Priority number, dateFR1996001114612.09.1996         Original published format: FR 9611146
[1999/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9811593
Date:19.03.1998
Language:FR
[1998/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0925599
Date:30.06.1999
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0925599
Date:13.06.2001
Language:FR
[2001/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.03.1998
ClassificationIPC:H01J37/05
[1999/26]
CPC:
H01J37/05 (EP,US); H01J2237/055 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1999/26]
TitleGerman:ENERGIEFILTER, TRANSMISSIONSELEKTRONENMIKROSKOP UND ASSOZIIERTES ENERGIEFILTERUNGSVERFAHREN[2000/32]
English:ENERGY FILTER, TRANSMISSION ELECTRON MICROSCOPE AND ASSOCIATED METHOD FOR FILTERING ENERGY[1999/26]
French:FILTRE D'ENERGIE, MICROSCOPE ELECTRONIQUE A TRANSMISSION ET PROCEDE DE FILTRAGE D'ENERGIE ASSOCIE[1999/26]
Former [1999/26]ENERGIEFILTER, TRANSMISSIONSELEKTRONEMIKROSKOP UND DAZU ANWENDBARES ENERGIEFILTERUNGSVERFAHREN
Entry into regional phase12.04.1999National basic fee paid 
12.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/26]
05.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.12.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2001Fee for grant paid
12.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[DY]EP0538938  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [DY]  - UHLEMANN S ET AL, "THE MANDOLINE FILTER - A NEW HIGH-PERFORMANCE IMAGING FILTER FOR SUB-EV EFTEM", OPTIK, (19940601), vol. 96, no. 4, pages 163 - 178, XP000454755 [DY] 1-10 * page 165, column R, paragraph L - page 166, column L, paragraph 2; figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.