Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0934942

EP0934942 - NOVEL BETA-LACTAM COMPOUNDS AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.05.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, LIMITED
2-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu 541 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
SUMITOMO PHARMACEUTICALS COMPANY, LIMITED
2-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SUNAGAWA, Makoto
29-1, Yamada-Aza-Nobatake, Itami-shi
Hyogo 664 / JP
02 / YAMAGA, Hiroshi
11-15, Suehiro, Suita-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
03 / NOUDA, Hiroshi
1-2-23-1101, Chuo, Itami-shi
Hyogo 664 / JP
04 / SHINAGAWA, Hisatoshi
1-9-1-407, Tamagawa, Takatsuki-shi
Osaka 569 / JP
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1999/32]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97939146.303.09.1997
[1999/32]
WO1997JP03078
Priority number, dateJP1996025545004.09.1996         Original published format: JP 25545096
[1999/32]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9809965
Date:12.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0934942
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998
[1999/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.03.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D487/04, A61K31/40
[1999/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/32]
TitleGerman:BETA-LACTAM VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[1999/32]
English:NOVEL BETA-LACTAM COMPOUNDS AND PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME[1999/32]
French:NOUVELLES BETA-LACTAMINES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[1999/32]
Entry into regional phase01.03.1999Translation filed 
31.03.1999National basic fee paid 
31.03.1999Search fee paid 
31.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
31.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/32]
06.05.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200105   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9604282  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-12 *;
 [Y]EP0061231  (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1-11 *;
 [A]US4477662  (CORBETT DAVID F [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 5 - line 10; claim 1 *
 [A]  Y. SUMITA ET AL., "Antimicrobial Activity of SM-17466, a Novel Carbapenem Antibiotic with Potent Activity against Methicillin-Resistant Staphylococcus aureus", ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1995), vol. 39, no. 4, pages 910 - 916, XP000654095 [A] 1-9 * figure 1; table 1 *
 [A]  M. SUNAGAWA ET AL., "Synthesis and biological properties of a new series of anti-MRSA beta-lactams; 2-(thiazol-2'-ylthio)carbapenems", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1994), vol. 4, no. 23, pages 2793 - 2798, XP000654066 [A] 1-9 * tables 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(01)80596-5
International search[A]JPH072856  (SANKYO CO);
 [A]WO9429313  (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP], et al)