Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0862239

EP0862239 - MULTIPLE FREQUENCY ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2005
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Antena Kabushiki Kaisha
49-8, Nishiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku
Tokyo 116 / JP
[2005/08]
Former [1998/36]For all designated states
Nippon Antena Kabushiki Kaisya
49-8, Nishiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku
Tokyo 116 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / IMAHIGASHI, Hirotsugu, Nippon Antena Kabushiki K.
7-4, Kitamachi 4-chome,Warabi-shi
Saitama 335 / JP
02 / INOUE, Jinichi, Nippon Antena Kabushiki Kaisha .
7-4, Kitamachi 4-chome,Warabi-shi
Saitam 335 / JP
03 / EHARA, Tsuneo, Nippon Antena Kabushiki Kaisha .
7-4, Kitamachi 4-chome,Warabi-shi
Saitama335 a / JP
[1998/36]
Representative(s)Moncheny, Michel , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/36]Moncheny, Michel , et al
c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date97939221.408.09.1997
[1998/36]
WO1997JP03159
Priority number, dateJP1996026374413.09.1996         Original published format: JP 26374496
[1998/36]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9811624
Date:19.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0862239
Date:02.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998
[1998/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0862239
Date:23.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP19.03.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01Q5/00, H01Q1/22, H01Q21/30
[1998/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/36]
TitleGerman:MEHRFREQUENZ-ANTENNE[1998/36]
English:MULTIPLE FREQUENCY ANTENNA[1998/36]
French:ANTENNE A FREQUENCES MULTIPLES[1998/36]
Entry into regional phase13.05.1998Translation filed 
13.05.1998National basic fee paid 
13.05.1998Search fee paid 
13.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/36]
16.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2004Fee for grant paid
18.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
15.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
01.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200408   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB08.09.2005
IT08.09.2005
FR30.09.2005
[2008/44]
Former [2007/34]GB08.09.2005
IT08.09.2005
Former [2007/17]GB08.09.2005
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPH0794929  (NIPPON ANTENNA KK);
 [A]JPH08204442  (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO [JP]);
 [AP]JPH08335824  (HARADA IND CO LTD)