Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0946267

EP0946267 - MULTIPOLE ION GUIDE ION TRAP MASS SPECTROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  10.07.2015
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2015Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 12.08.2015  [2015/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PerkinElmer Health Sciences, Inc.
940 Winter Street
Waltham, MA 02451-1457 / US
[2010/33]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
ANALYTICA OF BRANFORD, INC.
29 Business Park Drive
Branford, CT 06405 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WHITEHOUSE, Craig M.
Analytica of Branford, Inc.
29 Business Park Drive
Branford, CT 06405 / US
02 / DRESCH, Thomas
Analytica of Branford, Inc.
29 Business Park Drive
Branford, CT 06405 / US
03 / ANDRIEN, Bruce A.
Analytica of Branford, Inc.
29 Business Park Drive
Branford, CT 06405 / US
 [2015/33]
Former [2011/07]01 / WHITEHOUSE, Craig M.
Analytica of Branford, Inc., 29 Business Park Drive
Branford, CT 06405 / US
02 / DRESCH, Thomas
Analytica of Branford, Inc., 29 Business Park Drive
Branford, CT 06405 / US
03 / ANDRIEN, Bruce A.
Analytica of Branford, Inc., 29 Business Park Drive
Branford, CT 06405 / US
Former [1999/40]01 / WHITEHOUSE, Craig M.
Analytica of Branford, Inc., 29 Business Park Dr.
Branford, CT 06405 / US
02 / DRESCH, Thomas
Analytica of Branford, Inc., 29 Business Park Dr.
Branford, CT 06405 / US
03 / ANDRIEN, Bruce A.
Analytica of Branford, Inc., 29 Business Park Dr.
Branford, CT 06405 / US
Representative(s)Faulkner, Thomas John
Cleveland
10 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BR / GB
[2015/33]
Former [2010/14]Faulkner, Thomas John
Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Former [2008/33]Waldren, Robin Michael , et al
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2006/05]Waldren, Robin Michael , et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Former [1999/40]Waldren, Robin Michael
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date97939401.211.08.1997
[1999/40]
WO1997US14203
Priority number, dateUS1996069454209.08.1996         Original published format: US 694542
[1999/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9806481
Date:19.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0946267
Date:06.10.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998
[1999/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0946267
Date:06.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/27]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0946267
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01J49/42, H01J49/40, H01J49/34
[2000/01]
Former International [1999/40]B01D59/44, H01J49/00
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2015/33]
Former [1999/40]CH,  DE,  DK,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  SE 
TitleGerman:MULTIPOL IONENLEITER, IONENFALLE MASSENSPEKTROMETRIE[1999/40]
English:MULTIPOLE ION GUIDE ION TRAP MASS SPECTROMETRY[1999/40]
French:SPECTROMETRIE A PIEGEAGE D'IONS PAR GUIDE D'IONS MULTIPOLAIRES[1999/40]
Entry into regional phase09.03.1999National basic fee paid 
09.03.1999Search fee paid 
09.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/40]
07.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2011Fee for grant paid
07.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.09.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.04.2012  20.06.2012  WITHDRAWN
Micromass UK Limited
Stamford Avenue
Altrincham Road
Wilmslow SK9 4AX / GB
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2014/19]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.2012  20.06.2012  WITHDRAWN
Micromass UK Limited
Stamford Avenue
Altrincham Road
Wilmslow SK9 4AX / GB
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2012/30]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.2012  20.06.2012  WITHDRAWN
Micromass UK Limited
Floats Road Wythenshawe
Manchester M23 9LZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2012/21]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.2012  17.04.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Micromass UK Limited
Floats Road Wythenshawe
Manchester M23 9LZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
11.05.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.09.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.12.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.12.2014Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.04.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
03.07.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
30.06.2008Request for further processing filed
30.06.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
01.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200307   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2003
31.08.200509   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK06.07.2011
IT06.07.2011
SE06.07.2011
[2015/21]
Former [2012/10]SE06.07.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]US5420425  (BIER MARK E [US], et al) [A] 39-42 * column 10, lines 40-63; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE19511333  (BRUKER FRANZEN ANALYTIK GMBH [DE])
 [X]  - GLISH ET AL, "Tandem Quadrupole/Time-of-Flight Instrument for Mass Spectromety/Mass Spectrometry", ANAL.CHEM. (USA), ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (19841113), vol. 56, no. 13, page 2291-2295, XP002120797 [X] 1-3,35-42 *abstract*; page 2291, column R, paragraphs 2,3; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00277a007
International search[Y]US4963736
 [Y]US5420425
 [Y]US4731533
 [Y]EP0529885
 [Y]  REV. SCI. INSTRUMENTS, Vol. 63, No. 10, published October 1992, MICHEAL et al., "An Ion Trap Storage/Time-of-Flight", pp. 4277-4284. [Y]
OppositionWO9523018
 WO8300258
    - Rapid Comm. in Mass Spectometry (RCM), CLAYTON ET AL, vol. 6, pages 719 - 720,
    - Analytical Instrumentation, GLISH ET AL, vol. 16, pages 191 - 206,
    - Proceed of the 31st annual conference on Mass Spectometry, MUGA,