Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0955904

EP0955904 - SUTURING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2008
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HAYHURST, John O.
14751 SE Wanda Dr.
Milwaukie, OR 97267 / US
[1999/46]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/46]
Representative(s)Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 Munich / DE
Former [2007/18]Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [1999/46]Meddle, Alan Leonard , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date97939406.113.08.1997
[1999/46]
WO1997US14267
Priority number, dateUS1996070098121.08.1996         Original published format: US 700981
[1999/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9807374
Date:26.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0955904
Date:17.11.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998
[1999/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0955904
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04
[1999/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/46]
TitleGerman:NÄHSYSTEM[1999/46]
English:SUTURING SYSTEM[1999/46]
French:DISPOSITIF A SUTURER[1999/46]
Entry into regional phase04.03.1999National basic fee paid 
04.03.1999Search fee paid 
04.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/46]
26.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2007Fee for grant paid
27.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.10.2007
ES21.01.2008
[2008/29]
Former [2008/24]ES21.01.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]US4235238  (OGIU HISAO ET AL) [A] 1,11 * column 10, line 61 - column 11, line 58 *;
 [A]US4696300  (ANDERSON GARY) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 47 - line 54; figure 7 *;
 [A]US4669473  (LICHTMAN PHILIP R ET AL)
International search[XP]US5549631  ;
 [X]US5219335