Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971717

EP0971717 - CYTOTOXIC AMINO SUGAR AND RELATED SUGAR DERIVATIVES OF INDOLOPYRROLOCARBAZOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
5 Research Parkway
Wallingford, CT 06492-7660 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SAULNIER, Mark, George
34 Ponsett Road, P.O. Box 209
Higganum, CT 06441-0209 / US
02 / BALASUBRAMANIAN, Neelakantan
26 Horsebarn Lane
Madison, CT 06443 / US
03 / FRENNESSON, David, Bertil
164 Conrad Street
Naugatuck, CT 06770-2638 / US
04 / ST. LAURENT, Denis, R.
334 Cedar Street
Newington, CT 06111 / US
05 / LANGLEY, David, R.
29 Alexander Drive
Meriden, CT 06450 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Jones, Alan John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Jones, Alan John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date97939482.221.08.1997
[2000/03]
WO1997US14738
Priority number, dateUS19960024657P22.08.1996         Original published format: US 24657 P
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9807433
Date:26.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971717
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971717
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/70, C07H17/02, A61P35/00
[2000/15]
Former International [2000/03]A61K31/70, C07H17/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:ZYTOTOXISCHER AMINOZUCKER UND VERWANDTE ZUCKERDERIVATE VON INDOLOPYRROLOCARBAZOLEN[2000/03]
English:CYTOTOXIC AMINO SUGAR AND RELATED SUGAR DERIVATIVES OF INDOLOPYRROLOCARBAZOLES[2000/03]
French:AMINOSUCRE CYTOTOXIQUE ET DERIVES DE SUCRE ASSOCIES D'INDOLOPYRROLOCARBAZOLES[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase24.02.1999National basic fee paid 
24.02.1999Search fee paid 
24.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.02.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
11.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2001Fee for grant paid
08.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0450327  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * claims 1-4 *;
 [DA]EP0545195  (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-18 * abstract * * examples 1-52 * * claims 1-13 *;
 [DA]WO9604293  (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [DA] 1-18 * abstract *
International search[A]US5468849  (LAM KIN S [US], et al)