Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0922248

EP0922248 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SECURE TRANSACTION MANAGEMENT AND ELECTRONIC RIGHTS PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.08.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.09.2016  [2016/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intertrust Technologies Corporation
920 Stewart Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
[2012/12]
Former [2007/03]For all designated states
Intertrust Technologies Corp
955 Stewart Drive
Sunnyvale CA 94085-3913 / US
Former [1999/24]For all designated states
Intertrust Technologies Corp.
460 Oakmead Parkway
Sunnyvale, CA 94086-4708 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GINTER, Karl, L.
10404 43rd Avenue
Beltsville, MD 20705 / US
02 / SHEAR, Victor, H.
5203 Battery Lane
Bethesda, MD 20814 / US
03 / SIBERT, W., Olin
30 Ingleside Road
Lexington, MA 02173-2522 / US
04 / SPAHN, Francis, J.
2410 Edwards Avenue
El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US
05 / VAN WIE, David, M.
P.O. Box 5610
Eugene, OR 97405 / US
 [2007/28]
Former [1999/24]01 / GINTER, Karl, L.
10404 43rd Avenue
Beltsville, MD 20705 / US
02 / SHEAR, Victor, H.
5203 Battery Lane
Bethesda, MD 20814 / US
03 / SIBERT, W., Olin
30 Ingleside Road
Lexington, MA 02173-2522 / US
04 / SPAHN, Francis, J.
2410 Edwards Avenue
El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US
05 / VAN WIE, David, M.
1250 Lakeside Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
Representative(s)Arrowsmith, Peter Michael E. , et al
Cleveland
10 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/46]Arrowsmith, Peter Michael E. , et al
Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Former [1999/24]Smith, Norman Ian , et al
fJ CLEVELAND 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date97939670.229.08.1997
[1999/24]
WO1997US15243
Priority number, dateUS1996070620630.08.1996         Original published format: US 706206
[1999/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9809209
Date:05.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0922248
Date:16.06.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998
[1999/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[1999/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/24]
TitleGerman:SYSTEMEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR GESICHERTEN TRANSAKTIONSVERWALTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHEM RECHTSSCHUTZ[1999/24]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SECURE TRANSACTION MANAGEMENT AND ELECTRONIC RIGHTS PROTECTION[1999/24]
French:SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES DE GESTION DE TRANSACTIONS SECURISEES ET DE PROTECTION DE DROITS ELECTRONIQUES[1999/24]
Entry into regional phase18.03.1999National basic fee paid 
18.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/24]
13.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2003Date of oral proceedings
12.06.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2011Date of oral proceedings
07.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
07.11.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/38]
18.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/38]
Appeal following examination06.01.2012Appeal received No.  T0985/12
15.03.2012Statement of grounds filed
29.06.2016Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn
11.08.2003Appeal received No.  T1225/03
22.10.2003Statement of grounds filed
21.03.2007Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)EP05075626.1   Application withdrawn  : 15.06.2005
EP05076129.5  / EP1621960
EP08075029.2  / EP1914655
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.10.1999
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
02.11.2009Request for further processing filed
02.11.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
14.01.2002Request for further processing filed
14.01.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.02.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 15
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 16
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 17
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 18
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201519   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[YA]WO9002382  (INDATA CORP [US]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 18, paragraph 3 - page 21, paragraph 2 * * page 23, paragraph L - page 24, paragraph 1 * [A] 11-17;
 [YA]EP0715246  (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * [A] 11-17;
 [A]US5224163  (GASSER MORRIE [US], et al) [A] 11-16 * column W *;
 [A]WO9401821  (SECURE COMPUTING CORP [US]) [A] 17 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9403859  (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 17 * the whole document *
 [X]  - CHOUDHURY A K ET AL, "COPYRIGHT PROTECTION FOR ELECTRONIC PUBLISHING OVER COMPUTER NETWORKS", IEEE NETWORK: THE MAGAZINE OF COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, (199505), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 12 - 20, XP000505280 [X] 18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.386048
by applicantEP0715243
 EP0715244
 EP0715245
 EP0715246
 EP0715247
 WO9002382
 WO9624092
    - CHOUDHURY ET AL., "Copyright Protection for Electronic Publishing over Computer Networks", IEEE NETWORK: THE MAGAZINE OF COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, (1995), vol. 9