Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0922248 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0922248



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3970
17.08.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 2
10.08.2016 F3027 Closure of the appeal proceedings: non-payment of the renewal fee Appeal 1
04.08.2016 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
04.08.2016 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
18.04.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
05.10.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Appeal 2
17.09.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
07.05.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Appeal 1
03.05.2012 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
03.05.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
29.03.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
19.03.2012 Claims Appeal 2
19.03.2012 Claims Appeal 4
19.03.2012 Claims Appeal 2
19.03.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
15.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
15.03.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
15.03.2012 Claims Appeal 4
15.03.2012 Claims Appeal 2
15.03.2012 Claims Appeal 2
15.03.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
20.02.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
13.02.2012 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 4
10.01.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.01.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.01.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.11.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
14.11.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 18
07.11.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
07.11.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
07.11.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
07.11.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 17
07.11.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
07.11.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
07.11.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
13.10.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.10.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.10.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
15.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
15.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
15.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
15.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
15.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
15.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
15.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
15.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
15.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
15.09.2011 Description Search / examination 1
15.09.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
14.09.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
13.09.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
12.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
12.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
12.09.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
12.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
12.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
12.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
12.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
12.09.2011 Claims Search / examination 4
12.09.2011 Description Search / examination 1
12.09.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
07.09.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.06.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
02.06.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.05.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
24.05.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
24.05.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.04.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
11.04.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
05.04.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
05.04.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
30.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
30.09.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.11.2009 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
05.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
05.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
05.11.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.11.2009 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
02.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
02.11.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
02.11.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.11.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.11.2009 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
15.10.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.09.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
25.07.2008 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
24.07.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.07.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.01.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
10.01.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.05.2007 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
05.04.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 9
22.03.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.03.2007 Cover page: Decision (ex parte) Appeal 8
19.03.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.03.2007 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
03.02.2007 Claims Appeal 4
03.02.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.01.2007 Claims Appeal 4
31.01.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.12.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
16.12.2006 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
12.12.2006 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
20.10.2006 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 6
05.07.2006 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
26.01.2006 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
16.01.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.10.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 1175
01.04.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
05.02.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
28.11.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
24.10.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
22.10.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
14.08.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
11.08.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
27.06.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.06.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.06.2003 Annex to a communication Search / examination 10
12.06.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
12.06.2003 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
12.06.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
12.06.2003 Means of redress Search / examination 1
12.06.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
12.06.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
30.05.2003 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.03.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
27.02.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.02.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
21.02.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.02.2003 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.02.2002 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
17.01.2002 Claims Search / examination 15
17.01.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
17.01.2002 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
14.01.2002 Request for further processing Search / examination 22
05.11.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
27.07.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.07.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.07.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.03.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.10.2000 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
17.08.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.08.2000 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
15.08.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.08.2000 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
05.06.2000 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.02.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.05.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.03.1999 Claims Search / examination 14
22.03.1999 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 2
22.03.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
18.03.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
07.05.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 24
18.03.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
18.03.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 1166
29.08.1997 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
29.08.1997 Claims International Searching Authority 7
29.08.1997 Description International Searching Authority 994
29.08.1997 Drawings International Searching Authority 163