Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017889

EP1017889 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AN INDUSTRIAL YARN PA 6.6 WITH LITTLE COTTON WASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/28]INDUSTRIAL YARN PA 6.6 WITH LITTLE COTTON WASTE
[2000/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2003
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rhodia Industrial Yarns AG
6021 Emmenbrücke / CH
[2002/02]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
Rhodia Filtec AG
6021 Emmenbrücke / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BERGER, Luzius
Chemin des Laudes
F-81380 Lescure d'Albigeois / FR
02 / FISCHER, Klaus
Rosenberghalde 2
CH-6004 Luzern / CH
03 / LUVIZOTTO, José
Rua Oswaldo Cruz, 1010
CEP-09540-280 S o Caetano do Sul, SP / BR
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Herrmann, Peter Johannes
Rhodia Industrial Yarns AG Patentabteilung MB
6021 Emmenbrücke / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/05]Herrmann, Peter Johannes, Dr.
Rhodia Industrial Yarns AG Patentabteilung MB
6021 Emmenbrücke / CH
Former [2000/28]Herrmann, Peter Johannes, Dr.
Rhodia Filtec AG Patentabteilung MP
6021 Emmenbrücke / CH
Application number, filing date97939933.422.09.1997
[2000/28]
WO1997CH00357
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9915721
Date:01.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1017889
Date:12.07.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1017889
Date:27.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:D01F6/60
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLUSENARMENS PA 6.6 INDUSTRIEGARNS[2000/37]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AN INDUSTRIAL YARN PA 6.6 WITH LITTLE COTTON WASTE[2000/37]
French:PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION D'UN FIL INDUSTRIEL PA 6.6 A FAIBLE DENSITE DE CHARPIE[2000/37]
Former [2000/28]FLUSENARMES PA 6.6 INDUSTRIEGARN
Former [2000/28]INDUSTRIAL YARN PA 6.6 WITH LITTLE COTTON WASTE
Former [2000/28]FIL INDUSTRIEL PA 6.6 A FAIBLE DENSITE DE CHARPIE
Entry into regional phase23.03.2000National basic fee paid 
23.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
01.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2001Fee for grant paid
11.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
25.05.200003   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.2000
01.10.200105   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.2001
Cited inInternational search[E]CH688554  (RHONE POULENC FILTEC AG [CH]) [E] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9305097  (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE826615  (DU PONT) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0382569  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0092898  (ICI PLC [GB]) [DA] 1-3 * the whole document *