Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0919050

EP0919050 - ELECTRONIC ANTI-THEFT ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meto International GmbH
Ersheimer Strasse 69
69434 Hirschhorn/Neckar / DE
[1999/22]
Inventor(s)01 / ALTWASSER, Richard
Kocherstrasse 8
D-76684 Forst / DE
02 / LENDERING, Peter
Dr. Borggreveplein 4
NL-7060 CR Terborg / NL
[1999/22]
Representative(s)Menges, Rolf , et al
Ackmann Menges
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 14 04 31
80454 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/30]Menges, Rolf , et al
Ackmann Menges Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 14 04 31
80454 München / DE
Former [2000/18]Menges, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Ackmann, Menges & Demski, Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 31
80454 München / DE
Former [1999/30]Franzen, Peter
Meto International GmbH, Patent Department, Westerwaldstrasse 3-13
64646 Heppenheim / DE
Application number, filing date97940042.129.07.1997
[1999/22]
WO1997EP04116
Priority number, dateDE199613177506.08.1996         Original published format: DE 19631775
DE199710572314.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19705723
[1999/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9806075
Date:12.02.1998
Language:DE
[1998/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0919050
Date:02.06.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1998
[1999/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0919050
Date:22.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/12]
Search report(s)International search reportEP12.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/24
[1999/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/22]
TitleGerman:SICHERUNGSELEMENT FÜR DIE ELEKTRONISCHE ARTIKELSICHERUNG[1999/22]
English:ELECTRONIC ANTI-THEFT ELEMENT[1999/22]
French:ELEMENT ANTIVOL ELECTRONIQUE[1999/22]
Entry into regional phase27.11.1998National basic fee paid 
27.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/22]
12.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.1999Fee for grant paid
27.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]US4498076  (LICHTBLAU GEORGE J [US]) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0285559  (DURGO AG [CH]) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0509289  (KOBE PROPERTIES LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *